This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2021 at 09:56:02 (UTC).

Weber v. Schneider National Carriers, Inc

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 Weber filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Schneider National Carriers, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Campbell Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00657

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Campbell Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Walter Weber

Defendant

Schneider National Carriers, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel William Packard

Attorney at The Packard Law Firm

1100 Nw Loop 410, Suite 104

San Antonio, TX 78213

Defendant Attorney

H Mark Burck

Attorney at Hanszen Laporte LLP

14201 Memorial Drive

Houston, TX 77079

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Walter Weber (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Schneider National, Inc. for Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Burck, H) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER setting Rule 26 deadlines. Meeting Report due by 3/4/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 1/25/2021. (ndc) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Schneider National Carriers, Inc, filed by Walter Weber. (Filed in state court as "Plaintiff's First Amended Petition with Request for Disclosure")(mll, ) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#2

(#2) Original ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Schneider National Carriers, Inc.(Burck, H) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit E - Civil Filing Details

1 #4

Exhibit D - Party and Attorney List

1 #3

Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Defendant's Original Answer

1 #1

Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Amended Petition

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Schneider National Carriers, Inc from Gregg County Civil Court at Law No. 2, case number 2020-2175-CCL2. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8167834), filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Original Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Party and Attorney List, #5 Exhibit E - Civil Filing Details)(Burck, H) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Walter Weber (Packard, Daniel) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Schneider National, Inc. for Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Burck, H) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER setting Rule 26 deadlines. Meeting Report due by 3/4/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 3/11/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 1/25/2021. (ndc) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his court-website page. Noncompliance with those standing orders may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walter Weber. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Schneider National Carriers, Inc, filed by Walter Weber. (Filed in state court as "Plaintiff's First Amended Petition with Request for Disclosure")(mll, ) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge J. Campbell Barker. (ksd ) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original ANSWER to Complaint First Amended by Schneider National Carriers, Inc.(Burck, H) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Schneider National Carriers, Inc from Gregg County Civil Court at Law No. 2, case number 2020-2175-CCL2. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8167834), filed by Schneider National Carriers, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Original Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Party and Attorney List, #5 Exhibit E - Civil Filing Details)(Burck, H) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer H Mark Burck