This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/05/2022 at 07:34:46 (UTC).

Weber v. Frost-Arnett Company

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 Weber filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Frost-Arnett Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric R. Komitee and Robert M. Levy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03989

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric R. Komitee

Referral Judge

Robert M. Levy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ari Weber

Defendant

Frost-Arnett Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Jon Fishbein

Attorney at Adam J. Fishbein, P.C.

735 Central Avenue

Woodmere, NY 11598

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Collection Letter

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Frost-Arnett Company. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ari Weber. Frost-Arnett Company served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022. (Fishbein, Adam) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ari Weber (Fishbein, Adam) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ari Weber (Fishbein, Adam) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketORDER: A complaint in the above captioned case was filed on July 7, 2022 and an answer was due on August 4, 2022. To date, no answer has been filed. Plaintiff is ordered to either move for entry of default or submit a written explanation to the Court as to why it has not done so by September 9, 2022. Failure to comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including a recommendation to Judge Eric R. Komitee that this case be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/17/2022. (Marino, Janine) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ari Weber. Frost-Arnett Company served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022. (Fishbein, Adam) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Frost-Arnett Company. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Frost-Arnett Company filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15725631 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Ari Weber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collection Letter, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Fishbein, Adam) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FROST ARNETT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Jon Fishbein