This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:47:29 (UTC).

Weber v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Weber filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sean P. Flynn and Mary S. Scriven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00024

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

Presiding Judge

Mary S. Scriven

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Weber

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

SSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Alan Steinberg

Attorney at Michael A. Steinberg & Associates

Suite 195, 4925 Independence Pkwy

Tampa, FL 33634

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/7/2020. (MR) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 1/6/2020. (CKR) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF of service by Christopher Weber as to Regional Chief Counsel. (CRH) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF of service by Christopher Weber as to Attorney General of the United States. (CRH) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS returned executed by Christopher Weber. United States Attorney served on 1/23/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (CRH) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (LD) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Christopher Weber. Related case(s): no (Steinberg, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/21/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/7/2020. (MR) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket(#5) ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/2010. (LD) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 1/6/2020. (CKR) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:20-cv-24-T-35SPF. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. (SJB) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Christopher Weber. (Steinberg, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Christopher Weber. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Steinberg, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.