This case was last updated from PACER on 08/22/2021 at 07:32:54 (UTC).

Weber et al v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On June 23, 2021, Eugene Weber and Joy Weber (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Reza Breakstone of Breakstone, White & Gluck, P.C. filed a personal injury lawsuit against Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier, LLC, and James Jackson (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking damages and costs of litigation for alleged carelessness and negligence of James Jackson in the operation of his Uber vehicle while serving as a servant, agent, or employee of Rasier, LLC. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the District of Massachusetts.

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiffs alleged that, “On or about June 27, 2018, plaintiff, Eugene Weber, was entering into a vehicle which he had hired using the Uber application on his telephone. The Uber vehicle was operated by James Jackson. The location of the pick-up was on Bartlett Farm Road in Nantucket, Massachusetts. On or about June 27, 2018, Mr. Jackson began driving away before Mr. Weber was fully in the vehicle.”

 

It was further alleged by the Plaintiffs that, “The cause of the incident described above was the carelessness and negligence of James Jackson in the operation of his Uber vehicle while serving as a servant, agent, or employee of Uber Technologies, Inc.”

 

The Plaintiffs further alleged that, “As a result of the incident described above, the plaintiff, Eugene Weber, was caused to sustain severe, permanent personal injuries, to suffer great pain of body and anguish of mind, and has expended large sums of money for medical care – currently totaling approximately $77,000 – and will continue to expend large sums of money for medical care and attendance.”

 

Plaintiffs also alleged that “As a result of the injuries to Mr. Weber, Plaintiff Joy Weber, suffered a loss of her husband’s companionship, society, support and affection.”

 

There are six claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiffs. The first and second claims are against Uber Technologies Inc. for damages caused by alleged negligence and alleged loss of consortium caused by negligence. The third and fourth claims are against Rasier Inc., dealing with damages caused by alleged negligence and alleged loss of consortium caused by negligence. The fifth and sixth claims are against James Jackson for damages caused by alleged negligence and alleged loss of consortium caused by negligence. 

 

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiffs individually requested the Court to enter judgment, in the amount of her damages, together with interest and costs as permitted by law, against the defendants, Uber Technologies, Inc., Rasier, LLC and James Jackson. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.




Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-11043

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Stearns

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joy Weber

Eugene Weber

Defendants

James Jackson

Uber Technologies, Inc.

Rasier, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reza Breakstone

Attorney at Breakstone, White & Gluck, P.C.

Two Center Plaza, Suite 530

Boston, MA 02108

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

1 #5

Supplement Summons

1 #4

Supplement Summons

1 #3

Supplement Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8832384 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Eugene Weber, Joy Weber. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Supplement Summons, #4 Supplement Summons, #5 Supplement Summons)(Breakstone, Reza) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8832384 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Eugene Weber, Joy Weber. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Supplement Summons, #4 Supplement Summons, #5 Supplement Summons)(Breakstone, Reza) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RASIER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant