This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2022 at 07:56:12 (UTC).

Weber et al v. Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Weber filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven D. Merryday and Sean P. Flynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00154

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Merryday

Referral Judge

Sean P. Flynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Peter Weber

Patricia Weber

Defendant

Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest

Not Classified By Court

Gerald T. Albrecht

Tampa, FL 33618-4312

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Travis Dale Watson

Attorney at Travis Watson, P.A.

17862 Hunting Bow Cir Ste 102

Lutz, FL 33558

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas A. Keller

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602-4327

Erin Isdell

Attorney at Butler Weihmuller Katz Craig LLP

400 N Ashley Drive., Suite 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Gerald T. Albrecht

Attorney at Albrecht Mediation Services

3350 Buschwood Park Dr Ste 130

Tampa, FL 33618-4312

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on September 12, 2022 at 1:30pm before Gerald T. Albrecht. (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#17

(#17) ORDER re #16--mediation order; permitting the parties to appear by video with the mediator's approval. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/8/2022. (KRM) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER appointing Gerald T. Albrecht as the mediator; designating Thomas A. Keller as lead counsel; directing lead counsel to coordinate the date and time of mediation and to file a notice of mediation within seven days after this order; directing the parties to mediate by 9/30/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/8/2022. (KRM) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#15

(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final pretrial conference scheduled for 7/25/2023 at 10:00AM in Tampa Courtroom 11B before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn; jury trial scheduled for the August 2023 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/1/2022. (KRM) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#14

(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Patricia Weber, Peter Weber. (Watson, Travis) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Travis Dale Watson on behalf of Patricia Weber, Peter Weber. Lead Counsel: Travis Watson. (Watson, Travis) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

10 #1

Exhibit 1 - Policy

#10

(#10) Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy)(Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Thomas A. Keller on behalf of Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest. Lead Counsel: Thomas A. Keller, Esq. (Keller, Thomas) Modified text on 1/21/2022 (MCB). (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest. Related case(s): No (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 4 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, a Swiss company, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., a Delaware corporation for Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#5

(#5) ***COUNSEL REFILED CORRECTLY AT DE #7 ***NOTICE by Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest Defendant's Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Keller, Thomas) Modified text on 1/20/2022 (MCB). (Entered: 01/20/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Keller on behalf of Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit C - Harrell adjusting Services estimate

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 10th Judicial Circuit, case number 2021-CA-003446 filed in State Court on 12/8/2021. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19134386 filed by Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B - Property Appraiser Record, #4 Exhibit C - Harrell adjusting Services estimate, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keller, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/20/2022: #6 State Court Complaint) (BD). Modified on 1/20/2022 to correct docket text and attachment (BD). (Entered: 01/19/2022)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on September 12, 2022 at 1:30pm before Gerald T. Albrecht. (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER re #16--mediation order; permitting the parties to appear by video with the mediator's approval. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/8/2022. (KRM) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER appointing Gerald T. Albrecht as the mediator; designating Thomas A. Keller as lead counsel; directing lead counsel to coordinate the date and time of mediation and to file a notice of mediation within seven days after this order; directing the parties to mediate by 9/30/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/8/2022. (KRM) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final pretrial conference scheduled for 7/25/2023 at 10:00AM in Tampa Courtroom 11B before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn; jury trial scheduled for the August 2023 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/1/2022. (KRM) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Patricia Weber, Peter Weber. (Watson, Travis) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Travis Dale Watson on behalf of Patricia Weber, Peter Weber. Lead Counsel: Travis Watson. (Watson, Travis) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy)(Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Thomas A. Keller on behalf of Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest. Lead Counsel: Thomas A. Keller, Esq. (Keller, Thomas) Modified text on 1/21/2022 (MCB). (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest. Related case(s): No (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 4 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, a Swiss company, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., a Delaware corporation for Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ***COUNSEL REFILED CORRECTLY AT DE #7 ***NOTICE by Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest Defendant's Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Keller, Thomas) Modified text on 1/20/2022 (MCB). (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c)and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2).-Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Keller on behalf of Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest (Keller, Thomas) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:22-cv-0154-SDM-SPF. (SJB) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 10th Judicial Circuit, case number 2021-CA-003446 filed in State Court on 12/8/2021. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19134386 filed by Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B - Property Appraiser Record, #4 Exhibit C - Harrell adjusting Services estimate, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keller, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/20/2022: #6 State Court Complaint) (BD). Modified on 1/20/2022 to correct docket text and attachment (BD). (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gerald T. Albrecht(Designation Retained)