This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2020 at 09:47:05 (UTC).

Webbs v. United States Steel Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2020 Webbs filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against United States Steel Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Theresa L Springmann and Andrew P Rodovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00151

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Theresa L Springmann

Referral Judge

Andrew P Rodovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERRENCE WEBBS

Laporte, IN 46350

Defendants

TMS INTERNATIONAL, LLC

JOHN DOE II

UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION

JOHN DOE I

TMS International LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew S Sims

Attorney at Rapoport Weisberg & Sims PC

20 N Clark St Ste 3500

Chicago, IL 60602

Katherine A Franke

Attorney at Cline Farrell Christie Lee & Bell PC

951 N Delaware St

Indianapolis, IN 46202-3377

Defendant Attorneys

Paul T Belch

Attorney at Travelers Staff Counsel Office - Ind/IN

Po Box 64093

St Paul, MN 55164

Lynsey F David

Attorney at Lewis Wagner LLP

501 Indiana Ave Ste 200

Indianapolis, IN 46202

Katherine S Strawbridge

Attorney at Lewis Wagner LLP

501 Indiana Ave Ste 200

Indianapolis, IN 46202

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1-State Court Record-Docket Sheet, Complaint, Appearance, Summons, Certi

1 #2

Supplement First Amended Complaint

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

13 #1

Affidavit of Matthew S. Sims

#14

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER GRANTING #13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Katherine A. Franke and Matthew S. Sims filed by Terrence Webbs. Katherine A. Franke and Matthew S. Sims are WITHDRAWN as counsel for the plaintiff, Terrence Webbs. The Clerk is DIRECTED to show the plaintiff as pro se and to send future notices to the plaintiff at 3011 US-6, La Porte, Indiana 46350. The court VACATES the Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2020. The court SETS this matter for an in-person Status Conference before Magistrate Judge Andrew P. Rodovich on 7/10/2020 at 10:00 a.m. (Central Time) in US District Court Hammond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/15/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Katherine A. Franke and Matthew S. Sims by Plaintiff Terrence Webbs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew S. Sims)(Franke, Katherine) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A Franke on behalf of Terrence Webbs (Franke, Katherine) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/29/2020 10:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1274 and enter access code 4620540# when prompted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/29/2020. (tc) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine S Strawbridge on behalf of United States Steel Corporation (Strawbridge, Katherine) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by TMS International LLC.(Belch, Paul) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/16/2020. (tc) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketChief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. *NEW CASE* (lhc) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul T Belch on behalf of TMS INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Belch, Paul) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4199432.) from Lake County Superior Court, Cause No. 45D01-1911-CT-001167, filed by TMS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Record-Docket Sheet, Complaint, Appearance, Summons, Certificate, Petition, Petition, Certificate, Order, Order, Appearance, Appearance, Order, Appearance, Answer, Motion, Order, Appearance, Motion, Order, Motion, Order, Amended Complaint, Summons, Certificate, Certificate, Answer, Appearance, Notice, Notice, #2 Supplement First Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Belch, Paul) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TMS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew S Sims