This case was last updated from PACER on 11/05/2020 at 07:11:55 (UTC).

Webb v. Warden et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2020 Webb filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Warden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul W. Grimm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02654

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul W. Grimm

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Matthew Webb

Westover, MD 21890

Respondents

Warden

Walter West

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Andrew DiMiceli

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General of Maryland

200 St. Paul Place, 17Th Floor

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Exhibit Transcript 4/5/19

#7

(#7) Correspondence re: Errata and Transcript (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript 4/5/19)(DiMiceli, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting Respondent's twenty-eight days to file copies of all post-conviction hearing transcripts; Petitioner IS GRANTED 28 days from the date the post-conviction hearing transcripts are filed to submit a Response to the Answer as specified herein. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/3/2020. (c/m jj2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

5 #8

Exhibit Transcript 2/12/04

5 #7

Exhibit Transcript 2/11/04

5 #6

Exhibit Transcript 5/5/03

5 #5

Exhibit Transcript 4/4/03

5 #4

Exhibit Transcript 1/22/03

5 #3

Exhibit Transcript 1/6/03

5 #2

Exhibit Transcript 9/13/02

5 #1

Exhibit State Record

#5

(#5) RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Warden, Walter West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Record, #2 Exhibit Transcript 9/13/02, #3 Exhibit Transcript 1/6/03, #4 Exhibit Transcript 1/22/03, #5 Exhibit Transcript 4/4/03, #6 Exhibit Transcript 5/5/03, #7 Exhibit Transcript 2/11/04, #8 Exhibit Transcript 2/12/04, #9 Exhibit Transcript 2/13/04, #10 Exhibit Transcript 4/12/04)(DiMiceli, Andrew) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

1 #5

Attachment

1 #4

Attachment

1 #3

Attachment

1 #2

Cover Letter

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Matthew Webb. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment)(jj2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Correspondence re: Errata and Transcript (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript 4/5/19)(DiMiceli, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting Respondent's twenty-eight days to file copies of all post-conviction hearing transcripts; Petitioner IS GRANTED 28 days from the date the post-conviction hearing transcripts are filed to submit a Response to the Answer as specified herein. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/3/2020. (c/m jj2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Warden, Walter West. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Record, #2 Exhibit Transcript 9/13/02, #3 Exhibit Transcript 1/6/03, #4 Exhibit Transcript 1/22/03, #5 Exhibit Transcript 4/4/03, #6 Exhibit Transcript 5/5/03, #7 Exhibit Transcript 2/11/04, #8 Exhibit Transcript 2/12/04, #9 Exhibit Transcript 2/13/04, #10 Exhibit Transcript 4/12/04)(DiMiceli, Andrew) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; Petitioner SHALL SUBMIT the $5.00 filing fee within twenty-eight (28) days. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 10/27/2020. (c/m jj2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew Webb (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER stating Petitioner SHALL SUBMIT the $5.00 filing fee or SHALL FILE a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis within twenty-eight (28) days; Respondents SHALL FILE an Answer to the Petition on or before FORTY (40) DAYS from the date of this Order; Petitioner MAY REPLY twenty-eight (28) days after service of Respondents Answer. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 9/24/2020. (c/m jj2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Matthew Webb. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment)(jj2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less