This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2020 at 10:00:12 (UTC).

Webb v. Acceptance Insurance First Acceptance Service Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Webb filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Acceptance Insurance First Acceptance Service Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Totenberg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03933

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Totenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terrance Landell Webb

Jonesboro, GA 30236

Defendant

Acceptance Insurance First Acceptance Service Inc.

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing action. (rlb)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER adopting #7 Final Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to obey a lawful order of the Court and want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/3/20. (rlb) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Compliance by Terrance Landell Webb re #4 Order. (jpa) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER for Service of #7 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 10/13/2020. (rjs) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#7

(#7) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #6 Complaint RECOMMENDING that this case be dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 41.3(A), NDGa., for want of prosecution and failure to obey a lawful order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 10/13/2020. (rjs) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

6 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

6 #1

Exhibit Letter

#6

(#6) COMPLAINT filed by Terrance Landell Webb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#5

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrance Landell Webb re #5 Notice (Other). (rlb) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#4

(#9) NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Compliance by Terrance Landell Webb re #4 Order. (jpa) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#3

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrance Landell Webb re #3 Order ruling on IFP,. (tmf) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#2

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrance Landell Webb re #2 Order. (eop) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (rlb) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrance Landell Webb re #10 Order on Final Report and Recommendation and #11 Clerk's Judgment. (rlb) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing action. (rlb)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER adopting #7 Final Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to obey a lawful order of the Court and want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/3/20. (rlb) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #7 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #6 Complaint, filed by Terrance Landell Webb, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (rlb) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE Of Filing Certificate of Compliance by Terrance Landell Webb re #4 Order. (jpa) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrance Landell Webb re #7 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and #8 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (rjs) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER for Service of #7 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 10/13/2020. (rjs) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #6 Complaint RECOMMENDING that this case be dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to Civil Local Rule 41.3(A), NDGa., for want of prosecution and failure to obey a lawful order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 10/13/2020. (rjs) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT filed by Terrance Landell Webb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rjs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrance Landell Webb re #5 Notice (Other). (rlb) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EIGHTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 09/28/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrance Landell Webb re #4 Order. (rlb) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Court's Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/28/20. (rlb) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrance Landell Webb re #3 Order ruling on IFP,. (tmf) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER DENYING In Forma Pauperis: Should he wish to proceed with his lawsuit, he must pay the Courts $400 filing fee within seven days of the date of this Order. Should Webb fail to timely pay the filing fee, this civil action may be dismissed pursuant to Civil Local Rule 41.3(A)(2), NDGa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 9/24/2020. (tmf) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Terrance Landell Webb re #2 Order. (eop) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/20. (eop) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Terrance Landell Webb. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit -Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less