This case was last updated from PACER on 01/21/2020 at 09:02:03 (UTC).

Webb et al v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 Webb filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sharion Aycock, David A. Sanders and Glen H. Davidson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00212

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David A. Sanders

Presiding Judges

Sharion Aycock

Glen H. Davidson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dan W. Webb

Rachael H. Webb

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Taylor Hamilton Webb

Attorney at TOLLISON LAW FIRM

103 North Lamar Blvd.

Oxford, MS 38655

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Summons Reissued as to Monsanto Company. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)

#5

(#5) Summons Reissued as to Monsanto Company. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 12/2/19. (jla)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1742964, filed by Dan W. Webb, Rachael H. Webb. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Dan W. Webb waiver sent on 12/6/2019; Rachael H. Webb waiver sent on 12/6/2019. (Webb, Taylor)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Dan W. Webb waiver sent on 12/6/2019; Rachael H. Webb waiver sent on 12/6/2019. (Webb, Taylor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Reissued as to Monsanto Company. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 12/2/19. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Reissued as to Monsanto Company. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1742964, filed by Dan W. Webb, Rachael H. Webb. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.