This case was last updated from PACER on 12/21/2020 at 09:31:29 (UTC).

Weaver v. General Motors, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 Weaver filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against General Motors, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jay C. Zainey and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02887

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay C. Zainey

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jimmy Weaver

Defendants

General Motors, LLC

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Collins Dalton

Attorney at Richard C. Dalton, L.L.C.

P.O. Box 358

Carencro, LA 70520-0358

Defendant Attorney

Margaret A. Cassisa

Attorney at Bernard, Cassisa, Elliott & Davis, APLC (Metairie)

3838 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 3050

Metairie, LA 70002

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Jury Trial set for 8/30/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jrc) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2020 10:40 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#5

(#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC for General Motors LLC (Cassisa, Margaret) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by General Motors LLC.Attorney Margaret A. Cassisa added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft).(Cassisa, Margaret) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC. (ajn) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against General Motors, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8561725) filed by Jimmy Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Richard Collins Dalton added to party Jimmy Weaver(pty:pla).(Dalton, Richard) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Jury Trial set for 8/30/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jrc) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2020 10:40 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC for General Motors LLC (Cassisa, Margaret) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by General Motors LLC.Attorney Margaret A. Cassisa added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft).(Cassisa, Margaret) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC. (ajn) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against General Motors, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8561725) filed by Jimmy Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Richard Collins Dalton added to party Jimmy Weaver(pty:pla).(Dalton, Richard) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less