This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/27/2022 at 08:28:11 (UTC).

Weaver et al v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2022 Weaver filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00116

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Weaver

Judy Weaver

Defendants

3M Company

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

Alfa Laval, Inc.

Ameron International Corporation

Ametek, Inc.

BW/IP International, Inc.

Cameron International Corporation

Clyde Union, Inc. d/b/a Clydeunion Pumps (sued individually and as successor-by- merger to Union Pump Company)

CSX Transportation, Inc.

Crane Co.

Eaton Hydraulics, LLC

Flowserve Corporation

Flowserve US, Inc.

FMC Corporation

General Electric Company

Goulds Pumps, Incorporated

Hercules LLC

IMO Industries, Inc.

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darren Patrick McDowell

Attorney at Fears Nachawati, PLLC

5489 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Kimberly M. Rosales

Attorney at Fears Nachawati, PLLC

5489 Blair Rd.

Dallas, TX 75231

Audrey Snyder

Attorney at Ward Black Law

208 West Wendover Avenue

Greensboro, NC 27401

Janet Ward Black

Attorney at Ward Black Law

208 West Wendover Avenue

Greensboro, NC 27401

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Edward Schulz

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

214 North Tryon Street, Suite 3700

Charlotte, NC 28202

Tracy E. Tomlin

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

301 South College Street, 23Rd Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202-4007

William Michael Starr

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP

301 South College Street, 23Rd Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202-4007

Alex J. Hagan

Attorney at Ellis & Winters

P. O. Box 33550

Raleigh, NC 27636

Travis W. Martin

Attorney at Ellis & Winters LLP

Post Office Box 2752, Zip Code 27402

300 N. Greene Street, SU 800

Douglas Andrew Rubel

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young LLP

P. O. Box 1285

Cary, NC 27512-1285

Kimberly Sullivan

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

One Wells Fargo Center

301 S. College Street, SU 3500

Mary Elizabeth O'Neill

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

One Wells Fargo Center

301 S. College Street, SU 3500

Stephanie G. Flynn

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

2 West Washington Street, Suite 1100, Post Office Box 87

Greenville, SC 29601

Timothy Peck

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

230 N. Elm Street, Suite 1200

Greensboro, NC 27401

Frank J. Gordon

Attorney at Millberg Gordon Stewart PLLC

1101 Haynes Street, Suite 104

Raleigh, NC 27604-1455

Emily Mather

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

4350 Lassiter At North Hills Avenue, Suite 300

Raleigh, NC 27609

Marla Tun Reschly

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

300 South Tryon Street, Suite 1000

Charlotte, NC 28202

Allison J. Becker

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

421 Fayetteville St., Ste 330

Raleigh, NC 27601

Kendra N. Stark

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

421 Fayetteville St., Ste 330

Raleigh, NC 27601

Lauren E. Fussell

Attorney at Williams Mullen

301 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1700, Post Office Box 1000 (Zip 27602)

Raleigh, NC 27601

14 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#129

(#129) Memorandum in Support regarding #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eaton Hydraulics, LLC. (Becker, Allison) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#128

(#128) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eaton Hydraulics, LLC. (Becker, Allison) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#127

(#127) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Velan Valve Corporation. (Becker, Allison) Modified on 5/24/2022 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#126

(#126) Financial Disclosure Statement by Ameron International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Grant Prideco, Inc. for Ameron International Corporation. (Martin, Travis) (Main Document 126 flattened and replaced on 5/23/2022) (Edwards, S.). (Entered: 05/18/2022)

#125

(#125) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Hercules LLC. (Rubel, Douglas) Modified on 5/17/2022 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#123

(#123) Notice of Appearance filed by Douglas Andrew Rubel on behalf of Hercules LLC. (Rubel, Douglas) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#122

(#122) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ametek, Inc. (Rubel, Douglas) Modified on 5/17/2022 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

#121

Notice to Counsel regarding: #125 Answer to Complaint, #122 Answer to Complaint, #120 Notice of Appearance, #124 Financial Disclosure Statement, #121 Financial Disclosure Statement, #123 Notice of Appearance. In future filings, counsel should indicate the division in accordance with Local Civil Rule 10.1(b) and 40.1(b) and (c). (Collins, S.) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#120

Notice to Counsel regarding: #125 Answer to Complaint, #122 Answer to Complaint, #120 Notice of Appearance, #124 Financial Disclosure Statement, #121 Financial Disclosure Statement, #123 Notice of Appearance. In future filings, counsel should indicate the division in accordance with Local Civil Rule 10.1(b) and 40.1(b) and (c). (Collins, S.) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of Special Appearance filed by Kimberly M. Rosales on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Rosales, Kimberly) Modified on 3/29/2022 to correct event language. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Notice of Special Appearance filed by Darren Patrick McDowell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (McDowell, Darren) Modified on 3/29/2022 to correct event language. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Audrey Snyder on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Snyder, Audrey) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Janet Ward Black on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Black, Janet Ward) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

2 #1

Financial Disclosure Form for Judy Weaver

#2

NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #2 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel is directed to file the financial disclosure statement for plaintiff Judy Weaver as a separate docket entry and not as an attachment. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#122) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ametek, Inc. (Rubel, Douglas) Modified on 5/17/2022 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

125 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#129) Memorandum in Support regarding #128 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eaton Hydraulics, LLC. (Becker, Allison) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eaton Hydraulics, LLC. (Becker, Allison) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Velan Valve Corporation. (Becker, Allison) Modified on 5/24/2022 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding #126 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel is reminded that the filing user must lock or "flatten" the PDF document. Failure to flatten documents may result in the clerk's office issuing a notice of deficiency. Counsel should "flatten" the document prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. (Castania, M) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#126) Financial Disclosure Statement by Ameron International Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Grant Prideco, Inc. for Ameron International Corporation. (Martin, Travis) (Main Document 126 flattened and replaced on 5/23/2022) (Edwards, S.). (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel regarding: #125 Answer to Complaint, #122 Answer to Complaint, #120 Notice of Appearance, #124 Financial Disclosure Statement, #121 Financial Disclosure Statement, #123 Notice of Appearance. In future filings, counsel should indicate the division in accordance with Local Civil Rule 10.1(b) and 40.1(b) and (c). (Collins, S.) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#125) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Hercules LLC. (Rubel, Douglas) Modified on 5/17/2022 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) Financial Disclosure Statement by Hercules LLC (Rubel, Douglas) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) Notice of Appearance filed by Douglas Andrew Rubel on behalf of Hercules LLC. (Rubel, Douglas) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ametek, Inc. (Rubel, Douglas) Modified on 5/17/2022 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Financial Disclosure Statement by Judy Weaver (Black, Janet Ward) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #2 Financial Disclosure Statement. Counsel is directed to file the financial disclosure statement for plaintiff Judy Weaver as a separate docket entry and not as an attachment. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval, Inc., Ameron International Corporation, Ametek, Inc., BW/IP International, Inc., CSX Transportation, Inc., Cameron International Corporation, Clyde Union, Inc., Crane Co., Eaton Hydraulics, LLC, FMC Corporation, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Hercules LLC, IMO Industries, Inc., Keckley Manufacturing Company, McNally Industries, LLC, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Railroad Friction Products Corporation, Standard Motor Products, Inc., Tate Andale, LLC, The William Powell Company, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viacomcbs Inc., Wabatec Global Services, Warren Pumps, LLC, Weil Pump Company, Inc., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Special Appearance filed by Kimberly M. Rosales on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Rosales, Kimberly) Modified on 3/29/2022 to correct event language. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Special Appearance filed by Darren Patrick McDowell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (McDowell, Darren) Modified on 3/29/2022 to correct event language. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance filed by Audrey Snyder on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Snyder, Audrey) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Appearance filed by Janet Ward Black on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Black, Janet Ward) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Financial Disclosure Statement by Judy Weaver, william weaver (Attachments: #1 *REFILED AT #8 **Financial Disclosure Form for Judy Weaver) (Black, Janet Ward) Modified on 3/30/2022 (Collins, S.). (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0417-6493820.), filed by Judy Weaver, william weaver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Black, Janet Ward) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EATON-HYDRAULICS INDIVIDUALLY & AS is a litigant

Latest cases where Hercules LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CLYDE UNION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Alfa Laval Inc. is a litigant