This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:37:44 (UTC).

Weaver #258996 v. Jerve

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Weaver 258996 filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Jerve. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ray Kent and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01027

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ray Kent

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jeffery Weaver #258996

Battle Creek, MI 49014-4066

Respondent

Andy Jerve

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit B

#4

(#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING HABEAS CASE to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals as second/successive; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT re #1 by petitioner Jeffery Weaver #258996 (ndj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#5

(#5) RETURNED MAIL: Copy of Order Transferring Case to CCA (Habeas) #4 that was sent via U.S. Mail to Jeffery Weaver returned to the Court marked Not Delivered as Addressed; Paroled via the MDOC Website; Unable to Forward (mlc) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

2 #1

Financial Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Jeffery Weaver #258996 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (ndj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by petitioner Jeffery Weaver #258996; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ndj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURNED MAIL: Copy of Order Transferring Case to CCA (Habeas) #4 that was sent via U.S. Mail to Jeffery Weaver returned to the Court marked Not Delivered as Addressed; Paroled via the MDOC Website; Unable to Forward (mlc) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUSCA CASE NUMBER 20-1054 assigned to second/successive Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 filed by Jeffery Weaver #258996 (mkc) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy of Order Transferring Case to CCA (Habeas) #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Jeffery Weaver (ndj) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TRANSFERRING HABEAS CASE to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals as second/successive; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT re #1 by petitioner Jeffery Weaver #258996 (ndj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by petitioner Jeffery Weaver #258996; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ndj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Jeffery Weaver #258996 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (ndj) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.