This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2021 at 12:38:33 (UTC).

Weatherspoon v. Torres et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 Weatherspoon filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Torres. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Mary Ann Vial Lemmon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03095

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Mary Ann Vial Lemmon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larrion Weatherspoon

Defendants

Luis Torres

B and B Construction, LLC

National Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric Anthony Wright

Attorney at Wright, Pichon & Gray, PLC

201 St. Charles Ave, Suite 3206

New Orleans, LA 70170

Daryl A. Gray

Attorney at Wright, Pichon & Gray, PLC

201 St. Charles Ave, Suite 3206

New Orleans, LA 70170

Jason P. Franco

Attorney at Wright & Gray

201 St. Charles Ave, Ste 3206, New Orleans

New Orleans, LA 70170

Defendant Attorneys

Raven Fielding

Attorney at Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Pfister, Weinstock & Bogart

Three Lakeway Center, 3838 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

Olivia C Mallary

Attorney at Duplass Zwain Bourgeois Pfister Weinstock & Bogart

3838 N Causeway Blvd, Suite 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

C. Michael Pfister

Attorney at Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Pfister, Weinstock & Bogart

Three Lakeway Center, 3838 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Notice of Compliance

1 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by National Indemnity Company.(Fielding, Raven) Modified text, added link on 12/1/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DIRECTIVE OF THE CLERK regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by National Indemnity Company. By the Clerk.(sbs) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2020-07656 "I-14" (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8596041) filed by National Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Compliance, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Raven Fielding added to party National Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Fielding, Raven) (Main Document 1 and Attachments 1-4 replaced on 11/16/2020) (sbs). Modified text on 11/16/2020 (sbs). (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where B & B Construction is a litigant

Latest cases where National Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olivia Catherine Mallary

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raven Fielding