This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2021 at 08:12:30 (UTC).

Weather Shield Mfg., Inc. v. Weathershield Restoration Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 Weather Shield Mfg , Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Weathershield Restoration Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Robert Blakey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01401

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Weather Shield Mfg., Inc.

Defendant

Weathershield Restoration Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Butler Berndt

Attorney at Honigman LLP

155 N Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60606

Mary Alexander Hyde

Attorney at Honigman LLP

Suite 3100, 155 N. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-1734

Defendant Attorneys

Brandon Matthew Beymer

Attorney at Saper Law Offices, Llc

505 N. Lasalle Street Suite 350, Suite 350

Chicago, IL 60654

Daliah Saper

Attorney at Saper Law Offices

505 N. Lasalle, #350

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint by Weathershield Restoration Inc.(Saper, Daliah) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion for extension of time to file answer #12 is granted and any answer shall be filed on or before 4/28/2021. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Weathershield Restoration Inc. by Brandon Matthew Beymer (Beymer, Brandon) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#12

(#12) MOTION by Defendant Weathershield Restoration Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Saper, Daliah) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Weathershield Restoration Inc. by Daliah Saper (Saper, Daliah) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Weather Shield Mfg., Inc. as to Weathershield Restoration Inc. on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. served on David C. Walker, Registered Agent, on March 19, 2021 (Berndt, William)(Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 3/25/2021 (bg, ). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 4/29/2021, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#8

(#8) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (ph, ) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

7 #1

(List of Trademarks)

#7

(#7) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 (List of Trademarks)) (ph, ) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Weather Shield Mfg., Inc. by Mary Alexander Hyde (Hyde, Mary) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#5

(#5) Plaintiff's Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Weather Shield Mfg., Inc. (Berndt, William) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Weather Shield Mfg., Inc. re complaint #1 (Berndt, William) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Weather Shield Mfg., Inc. by William Butler Berndt (Berndt, William) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by Weather Shield Mfg., Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18017034. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Berndt, William) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint by Weathershield Restoration Inc.(Saper, Daliah) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion for extension of time to file answer #12 is granted and any answer shall be filed on or before 4/28/2021. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Weathershield Restoration Inc. by Brandon Matthew Beymer (Beymer, Brandon) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION by Defendant Weathershield Restoration Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Saper, Daliah) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Weathershield Restoration Inc. by Daliah Saper (Saper, Daliah) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Weather Shield Mfg., Inc. as to Weathershield Restoration Inc. on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. served on David C. Walker, Registered Agent, on March 19, 2021 (Berndt, William)(Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 3/25/2021 (bg, ). (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Weathershield Restoration Inc. (crl, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 4/29/2021, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (ph, ) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 (List of Trademarks)) (ph, ) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mxo, ) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Weather Shield Mfg., Inc. by Mary Alexander Hyde (Hyde, Mary) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Plaintiff's Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Weather Shield Mfg., Inc. (Berndt, William) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Weather Shield Mfg., Inc. re complaint #1 (Berndt, William) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Weather Shield Mfg., Inc. by William Butler Berndt (Berndt, William) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Berndt, William) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by Weather Shield Mfg., Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18017034. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Berndt, William) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Weather Shield Mfg., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Butler Berndt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary Alexander Hyde