This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2023 at 00:33:57 (UTC).

WB Music Corp. et al v. Livemore, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 WB Music Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Livemore, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dolly M. Gee and Douglas F. McCormick. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-02049

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHEBRA MUSIC

Herbilicious Music

ESKAYWHY PUBLISHING

HI MOM I DID IT

WB Music Corp.

YEAH BABY MUSIC

PARTY ROCK MUSIC

Defendants

Livemore, L.L.C.

David Le Nguyen

Viet Hoai Tran

Melissa Chau Vu

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cassandra Eva Havens

Sharon Douglass Mayo

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

(#13) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal) (gk) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

13 #1

Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/02/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal) (gk) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Chebra Music, Eskaywhy Publishing, Herbilicious Music, Hi Mom I Did It, Party Rock Music, WB Music Corp., Yeah Baby Music. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Havens, Cassandra) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Summons Returned Unexecuted, #4 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Document No. 4. The correct event is Summons Request. You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants David Le Nguyen, Livemore, L.L.C., Melissa Chau Vu, Viet Hoai Tran. (lh) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/29/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (lh) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs CHEBRA MUSIC, ESKAYWHY PUBLISHING, HI MOM I DID IT, Herbilicious Music, PARTY ROCK MUSIC, WB Music Corp., YEAH BABY MUSIC, identifying American Society of Composers, Authors and Publishers. (Havens, Cassandra) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by CHEBRA MUSIC, ESKAYWHY PUBLISHING, HI MOM I DID IT, Herbilicious Music, PARTY ROCK MUSIC, WB Music Corp., YEAH BABY MUSIC. (Havens, Cassandra) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST filed as a Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiffs YEAH BABY MUSIC, HI MOM I DID IT, PARTY ROCK MUSIC, Herbilicious Music, CHEBRA MUSIC, WB Music Corp., ESKAYWHY PUBLISHING. as to David Le Nguyen, Livemore, L.L.C., Melissa Chau Vu, Viet Hoai Tran. (Havens, Cassandra) Modified on 10/29/2019 (lh). (Entered: 10/28/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Cassandra Havens re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 Regarding Joinder of Multiple Copyright Claims filed by Plaintiffs CHEBRA MUSIC, ESKAYWHY PUBLISHING, HI MOM I DID IT, Herbilicious Music, PARTY ROCK MUSIC, WB Music Corp., YEAH BABY MUSIC. (Havens, Cassandra) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs CHEBRA MUSIC, ESKAYWHY PUBLISHING, HI MOM I DID IT, Herbilicious Music, PARTY ROCK MUSIC, WB Music Corp., YEAH BABY MUSIC. (Havens, Cassandra) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24680873 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs YEAH BABY MUSIC, HI MOM I DID IT, PARTY ROCK MUSIC, Herbilicious Music, CHEBRA MUSIC, WB Music Corp., ESKAYWHY PUBLISHING. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party CHEBRA MUSIC(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party ESKAYWHY PUBLISHING(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party HI MOM I DID IT(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party Herbilicious Music(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party PARTY ROCK MUSIC(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party WB Music Corp.(pty:pla), Attorney Cassandra Eva Havens added to party YEAH BABY MUSIC(pty:pla))(Havens, Cassandra) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less