This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/02/2020 at 09:05:20 (UTC).

WB Music Corp. et al v. Harvey

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 WB Music Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Harvey. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John V. Acosta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00343

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John V. Acosta

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pure Love Music

Dirty Dre Music

Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc.

Toilet Brain Music

Naughty Music

Music From the Board Walk

Seven Peaks Music

Lil Vidal Music

That Was ZZ Music

Neutral Gray Music

Universal Music Corporation

WB Music Corp.

Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc.

Defendant

Donald Harvey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cassandra L. Mercer

Vicki L. Smith

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#7

 

Docket Entries

03/11/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon Donald Harvey served on 3/6/2020 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mercer, Cassandra) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Register of Copyrights - Copyright Office regarding Copyright Report #5 . (joha) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (joha) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Donald Harvey. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/1/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/31/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 7/31/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (joha) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mercer, Cassandra) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6349152 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Naughty Music, Neutral Gray Music, That Was ZZ Music, Toilet Brain Music, WB Music Corp., Seven Peaks Music, Uh Oh Entertainment, Inc., Wut' Shawan-A Do Music, Inc., Music From the Board Walk, Lil Vidal Music, Dirty Dre Music, Universal Music Corporation, Pure Love Music against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Mercer, Cassandra) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less