This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2021 at 08:06:50 (UTC).

Wawanesa General Insurance Company v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 Wawanesa General Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia A. Phillips and Alka Sagar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-08543

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wawanesa General Insurance Company

Defendant

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark R Nivinskus

Attorney at Nivinskus Law Group ALC

134 West Wilshire Avenue

Fullerton, CA 92832

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32235894 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Wawanesa General Insurance Company. (Attorney Mark R Nivinskus added to party Wawanesa General Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Nivinskus, Mark) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wawanesa General Insurance Company. (Nivinskus, Mark) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wawanesa General Insurance Company, (Nivinskus, Mark) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-08543-VAP-ASx. (aco) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#9

(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Wawanesa General Insurance Company. (Nivinskus, Mark) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#10

(#10) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (yl) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (yl) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Wawanesa General Insurance Company. (Nivinskus, Mark) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-08543-VAP-ASx. (aco) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wawanesa General Insurance Company, (Nivinskus, Mark) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wawanesa General Insurance Company. (Nivinskus, Mark) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32235894 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Wawanesa General Insurance Company. (Attorney Mark R Nivinskus added to party Wawanesa General Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Nivinskus, Mark) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark R Nivinskus