This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2022 at 08:32:43 (UTC).

Wave Linx LLC v. Unify Inc

Case Summary

On 10/20/2022 Wave Linx LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Unify Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brantley Starr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-02363

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brantley Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wave Linx LLC

Defendant

Unify Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew S Curfman

Attorney at Sand Sebolt & Wernow Co LPA

Aegis Tower- Suite 1100, 4940 Munson Street Nw

Canton, OH 44718

Hao Ni

Attorney at Ni Wang & Massand PLLC

8140 Walnut Hill Lane, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75231

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #3

Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (AO120) filed by Wave Linx LLC (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wave Linx LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mlb) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Unify Inc. (mlb) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#6

(#6) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mlb) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Exhibit(s) A-Certificate of Good Standing

7 #2

Exhibit(s) B-Courts of Admission

7 #3

Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Proposed Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Notice of Dismissal. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (ykp) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per #11 Notice of Dismissal. The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. (ykp) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Wave Linx LLC (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) The Court GRANTS the #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by 12/15/2022. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/14/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Wave Linx LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew S. Curfman. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 10/24/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-13242993) filed by Wave Linx LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit(s) B-Courts of Admission, #3 Proposed Order) (Curfman, Andrew) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/24/2022) (ygl). (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (mlb) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Unify Inc. (mlb) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mlb) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wave Linx LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (AO120) filed by Wave Linx LLC (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Unify, Inc. filed by Wave Linx LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13240795) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet) (Ni, Hao) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Unify Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wave Linx LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hao Ni

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew S. Curfman