This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/28/2023 at 08:14:35 (UTC).

Wave Linx LLC v. New Horizons Communications Corp.

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Wave Linx LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against New Horizons Communications Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. Steele and Nicholas P. Mizell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00754

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John E. Steele

Referral Judge

Nicholas P. Mizell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wave Linx LLC

Defendant

New Horizons Communications Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Howard L. Wernow

Andrew S. Curfman

Defendant Attorneys

Meaghan P.H. Kent

Robert Christian Bertin

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 1/25/2023. (RKR) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Dismissal without Prejudice by Wave Linx LLC. (Wernow, Howard) Modified text on 1/26/2023 (SEH). (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #17 motion for special admission of attorney Bertin. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/18/2023. (JMM) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#17

(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Robert C. Bertin to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20406011 for $150 by All Defendants. (Kent, Meaghan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Modified text on 1/19/2023 (SEH). (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #14 motion for special admission of attorney Curfman. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/6/2023. (JMM) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Andrew S. Curfman to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20370389 for $150 by Wave Linx LLC. (Wernow, Howard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (Entered: 01/05/2023)

#9

(#12) ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer complaint. By January 25, 2023, defendant must respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/27/2022. (JMM) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

7 #1

Exhibit A-Related Cases

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Howard L. Wernow on behalf of Wave Linx LLC. Lead Counsel: Howard L. Wernow. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued as to New Horizons Communications Corp. (SEH) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#4

(#4) CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/30/2022. (SEH) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Wave Linx LLC identifying Other Affiliate Mavexar LLC for Wave Linx LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B-Claim Chart

1 #1

Exhibit A-US8843549

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 1/25/2023. (RKR) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Dismissal without Prejudice by Wave Linx LLC. (Wernow, Howard) Modified text on 1/26/2023 (SEH). (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 motion for special admission of attorney Bertin. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/18/2023. (JMM) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Robert C. Bertin to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20406011 for $150 by All Defendants. (Kent, Meaghan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Modified text on 1/19/2023 (SEH). (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE to counsel Robert C, Bertin of Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(G), which requires members of the Middle District bar to register with the Middle District CM/ECF system by submitting an e-file registration through PACER. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (WRW) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 motion for special admission of attorney Curfman. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 1/6/2023. (JMM) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Andrew S. Curfman to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20370389 for $150 by Wave Linx LLC. (Wernow, Howard) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2023 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Parties shall file a Case Management Report by 2/6/2023. All parties shall appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 22754. All parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. (WRW) (Entered: 01/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer complaint. By January 25, 2023, defendant must respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/27/2022. (JMM) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE to counsel Robert C. Bertin Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SEH) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by New Horizons Communications Corp.. (Kent, Meaghan) (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by New Horizons Communications Corp. (Kent, Meaghan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Modified text on 12/27/2022 (SEH). (Entered: 12/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of service executed on 12/05/2022 by Wave Linx LLC as to New Horizons Communications Corp. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Wave Linx LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Related Cases)(Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Howard L. Wernow on behalf of Wave Linx LLC. Lead Counsel: Howard L. Wernow. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued as to New Horizons Communications Corp. (SEH) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/30/2022. (SEH) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Docket(#3) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:22-cv-0754-JES-NPM. (SJB) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Wave Linx LLC identifying Other Affiliate Mavexar LLC for Wave Linx LLC. (Wernow, Howard) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Infringement of Patent against New Horizons Communications Corp. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20246821) filed by Wave Linx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US8843549, #2 Exhibit B-Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Wernow, Howard) Modified text on 11/30/2022 (SEH). (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less