This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/27/2022 at 08:27:46 (UTC).

Wave Linx LLC v. Lifesize, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 Wave Linx LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Lifesize, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00432

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wave Linx LLC

Defendant

Lifesize, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jimmy Chong

Attorney at Chong Law Firm

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

Raymond W Mort, III

Attorney at The Mort Law Firm, PLLC

501 Congress Ave, Suite 150

Austin, TX 78701

Defendant Attorneys

Dwayne K. Goetzel

Attorney at Kowert, Hood, Munyon, Rankin & Goetzel, PC

1120 S. Capital Of Texas Highway

John Michael Guaragna

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

303 Colorado Street, Suite 3000

Austin, TX 78701

Michael Strapp

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP (US)

33 Arch Street, 26Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Strapp for Lifesize, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Unopposed Extension of Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Lifesize, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Venue Discovery by Wave Linx LLC (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Michael G. Strapp ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16126140) by on behalf of Lifesize, Inc.. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Michael Guaragna on behalf of Lifesize, Inc.. Attorney John Michael Guaragna added to party Lifesize, Inc.(pty:dft) (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wave Linx LLC. Lifesize, Inc. served on 5/6/2022, answer due 5/27/2022. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Exhibit A-B

#8

(#8) Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case by Lifesize, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Proposed Order)(Goetzel, Dwayne) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jimmy Chong. Attorney added for Wave Linx LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot3) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III for Jimmy Chong ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15980870) by on behalf of Wave Linx LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Lifesize, Inc. (sv) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Wave Linx LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wave Linx LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15979413), filed by Wave Linx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Strapp for Lifesize, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (sm3) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Lifesize, Inc. answer due 6/27/2022. (zv) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Unopposed Extension of Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Lifesize, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Venue Discovery by Wave Linx LLC (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Guaragna for Michael G. Strapp ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16126140) by on behalf of Lifesize, Inc.. (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Michael Guaragna on behalf of Lifesize, Inc.. Attorney John Michael Guaragna added to party Lifesize, Inc.(pty:dft) (Guaragna, John) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wave Linx LLC. Lifesize, Inc. served on 5/6/2022, answer due 5/27/2022. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case by Lifesize, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B, #2 Proposed Order)(Goetzel, Dwayne) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jimmy Chong. Attorney added for Wave Linx LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot3) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Raymond W Mort, III for Jimmy Chong ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15980870) by on behalf of Wave Linx LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (sv) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Lifesize, Inc. (sv) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Wave Linx LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wave Linx LLC. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15979413), filed by Wave Linx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Mort, Raymond) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lifesize, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Wave Linx LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dwayne K. Goetzel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael G. Strapp