This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2023 at 08:40:45 (UTC).

Wave Linx LLC v. Convoso, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Wave Linx LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Convoso, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-08555

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

wave linx llc

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Convoso, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Andrew S. Curfman

Karthik Krishna Murthy

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorney

Michael Richard Headley

 

Court Documents

21 #1

Proposed Order

#21

(#21) Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by plaintiff Wave Linx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Murthy, Karthik) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 3/10/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Convoso, Inc., (Headley, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND and, COUNTERCLAIM against Wave Linx LLC filed by Defendant Convoso, Inc..(Attorney Michael Richard Headley added to party Convoso, Inc.(pty:dft))(Headley, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Karthik Krishna Murthy counsel for Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC. Changing firm name to Murthy IP Inc.. Filed by Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC. (Murthy, Karthik) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER IN RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew S. Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34390594) #13 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The document is stricken. (rolm) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 12/01/2022 SEE DOCKET NO. 16] First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew S. Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34390594) filed by plaintiff Wave Linx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Murthy, Karthik) Modified on 12/1/2022 (rolm). (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff wave linx llc, identifying Wave Linx LLC, Andrew S. Curfman, Sand, Sebolt & Wernow Co., LPA, Karthik Murthy, Murthy Patent Law PLLC, Mavexar LLC. (Murthy, Karthik) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by wave linx llc. (Murthy, Karthik) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff wave linx llc. (Murthy, Karthik) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant wave linx llc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murthy, Karthik) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#18) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND and, COUNTERCLAIM against Wave Linx LLC filed by Defendant Convoso, Inc..(Attorney Michael Richard Headley added to party Convoso, Inc.(pty:dft))(Headley, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by plaintiff Wave Linx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Murthy, Karthik) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 3/10/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Convoso, Inc., (Headley, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND and, COUNTERCLAIM against Wave Linx LLC filed by Defendant Convoso, Inc..(Attorney Michael Richard Headley added to party Convoso, Inc.(pty:dft))(Headley, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Karthik Krishna Murthy counsel for Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC. Changing firm name to Murthy IP Inc.. Filed by Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC. (Murthy, Karthik) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER IN RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew S. Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34390594) #13 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The document is stricken. (rolm) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew S. Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34390594) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. (lt) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew S. Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34390594) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Please note DJ and MJ Notice of Reassignment, dated 11/28/22, Dkt. 10. (lt) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 12/01/2022 SEE DOCKET NO. 16] First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Andrew S. Curfman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34390594) filed by plaintiff Wave Linx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Murthy, Karthik) Modified on 12/1/2022 (rolm). (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC, upon Defendant Convoso, Inc. served on 11/29/2022, answer due 12/20/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cayli Baker, Employee, Corpnet, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Murthy, Karthik) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING TRANSFER AND/OR REASSIGNMENT OF PATENT CASE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads 2:22-cv-08555 AB(MRWx). (rn) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Convoso, Inc. (car) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff wave linx llc, identifying Wave Linx LLC, Andrew S. Curfman, Sand, Sebolt & Wernow Co., LPA, Karthik Murthy, Murthy Patent Law PLLC, Mavexar LLC. (Murthy, Karthik) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by wave linx llc. (Murthy, Karthik) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff wave linx llc. (Murthy, Karthik) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant wave linx llc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murthy, Karthik) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34368330 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff wave linx llc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Attorney Karthik Krishna Murthy added to party wave linx llc(pty:bkmov))(Murthy, Karthik) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less