This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2022 at 07:17:38 (UTC).

Wave Linx LLC v. CafeX Communication Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 Wave Linx LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against CafeX Communication Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01831

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wave Linx LLC

Defendant

CafeX Communication Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT filed with Jury Demand against CafeX Communication Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3771274.) - filed by Wave Linx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Related Cases, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Related Cases

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 8,843,549. (srs) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Wave Linx LLC. (srs) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to CafeX Communication Inc. on 12/28/2021. (srs) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wave Linx LLC. CafeX Communication Inc. served on 12/30/2021, answer due 1/20/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01831-LPS, 1:21-cv-01832-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wave Linx LLC. CafeX Communication Inc. served on 12/30/2021, answer due 1/20/2022. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to CafeX Communication Inc. on 12/28/2021. (srs) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Wave Linx LLC. (srs) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. 8,843,549. (srs) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (srs) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF PATENT filed with Jury Demand against CafeX Communication Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3771274.) - filed by Wave Linx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Related Cases, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(srs) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wave Linx LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimmy C. Chong