This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/23/2022 at 07:52:22 (UTC).

Wave Linx LLC v. Access One, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2022 Wave Linx LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Access One, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Edmond E. Chang. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05856

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmond E. Chang

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wave Linx LLC

Defendant

Access One, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven G Kalberg

Attorney at Direction IP Law

P.O. Box 14184

Chicago, IL 60614

Andrew S. Curfman

Attorney at Sand and Sebolt LPA

4940 Munson St. N.W., Suite 1100

Canton, OH 44718

David Randolph Bennett

Attorney at Direction IP Law

P.O. Box 14184, 2620 N. Burling St.,

Chicago, IL 60614

Defendant Attorney

Roger M Masson

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N. Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Pursuant to the notice of voluntary dismissal #17 , under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the case is dismissed without prejudice. Status hearing of 12/30/2022 is vacated. Civil case terminated. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wave Linx LLC without Prejudice (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#16

(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Defendant's opposed motion to use 25 pages for the anticipated dismissal motion #14 is granted. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Access One, Inc. (Masson, Roger) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#14

(#14) MOTION by Defendant Access One, Inc. for leave to file excess pages in a brief in support of motion to dismiss (Masson, Roger) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#13

(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Access One, Inc. by Roger M Masson (Masson, Roger) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Plaintiff's extension motion #10 (for the benefit of the Defendant) on the answer deadline is granted to 12/15/2022. The tracking status hearing of 11/25/2022 is reset to 12/30/2022 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the parties shall file the updated joint initial report by 12/20/2022.Emailed notice (eec) (Entered: 11/24/2022)

#11

(#11) STATUS Report by Wave Linx LLC (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION by Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC for extension of time to file answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#6

(#6) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (kl, ) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC by David Randolph Bennett (Bennett, David) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC by Steven G Kalberg (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Wave Linx LLC (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

1 #3

Exhibit B Claim Chart re Access One Web Conferencing

1 #2

Exhibit A United States Patent No. 8,843,549

1 #1

Exhibit List

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Pursuant to the notice of voluntary dismissal #17 , under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the case is dismissed without prejudice. Status hearing of 12/30/2022 is vacated. Civil case terminated. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wave Linx LLC without Prejudice (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Defendant's opposed motion to use 25 pages for the anticipated dismissal motion #14 is granted. Emailed notice (mw, ) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Access One, Inc. (Masson, Roger) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION by Defendant Access One, Inc. for leave to file excess pages in a brief in support of motion to dismiss (Masson, Roger) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Access One, Inc. by Roger M Masson (Masson, Roger) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The Plaintiff's extension motion #10 (for the benefit of the Defendant) on the answer deadline is granted to 12/15/2022. The tracking status hearing of 11/25/2022 is reset to 12/30/2022 at 8:30 a.m., but to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the parties shall file the updated joint initial report by 12/20/2022.Emailed notice (eec) (Entered: 11/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATUS Report by Wave Linx LLC (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC for extension of time to file answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Curfman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial tracking status hearing set for 11/25/2022 at 8:30 a.m. to track the case only (no appearance is required, the case will not be called). Instead, the Court will set the case schedule after reviewing the written status report. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements by 11/18/2022. Plaintiff must still file the report even if Defendant has not responded to requests to craft a joint report. If Defendant has not been served, then Plaintiff must complete the part of the report on the progress of service. Also, counsel must carefully review Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures, available online at ilnd.uscourts.gov (navigate to Judges / District Judges / Judge Edmond E. Chang). Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if the counsel or the party has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, ) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wave Linx LLC as to Access One, Inc. on 10/27/2022, answer due 11/17/2022. (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (kl, ) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC by David Randolph Bennett (Bennett, David) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Access One, Inc. (smb, ) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jk2, ) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jk2, ) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wave Linx LLC by Steven G Kalberg (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Wave Linx LLC (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Wave Linx LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-19975964. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit A United States Patent No. 8,843,549, #3 Exhibit B Claim Chart re Access One Web Conferencing)(Kalberg, Steven) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less