This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2020 at 07:01:28 (UTC).

Watts v. Moda Health Plan, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 Watts filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Moda Health Plan, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-08323

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carmen Watts

Defendants

Cochlear Americas

Cochlear Americas, Inc.

Moda Health Plan, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Michael Mavris

1 Point Saint George Place

Crescent City, CA 95531

Defendant Attorneys

John Robert Meehan

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

One Montgomery, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94104

Amir M. Nassihi

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

One Montgomery, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94104

Matthew Allen Trejo

Attorney at Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

101 Montgomery Street, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #14 Stipulation filed by Cochlear Americas. Response due 3/6/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/22/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION to Further Extend Time for Defendants Cochlear Americas and Moda Health Plan, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Cochlear Americas. (Meehan, John) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#13

(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/21/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

12 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#12

(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 01/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#10

(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Moda Health Plan, Inc... (Trejo, Matthew) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

(#9) NOTICE by Cochlear Americas re #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Meehan, John) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant Cochlear Americas, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/21/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cochlear Americas re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities (Meehan, John) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Cochlear Americas identifying Corporate Parent Cochlear Limited for Cochlear Americas. (Meehan, John) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Defendant Moda Health Plan, Inc.'s Consent to Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Demand for Jury Trial from Del Norte County Superior Court. Their case number is CVPI-2019-1268. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14001482). Filed by Cochlear Americas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant Moda Health Plan, Inc.'s Consent to Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meehan, John) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 Stipulation filed by Cochlear Americas. Response due 3/6/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/22/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION to Further Extend Time for Defendants Cochlear Americas and Moda Health Plan, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Cochlear Americas. (Meehan, John) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2020. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/21/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 01/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Moda Health Plan, Inc... (Trejo, Matthew) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE by Cochlear Americas re #1 Notice of Removal, has been filed in State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Meehan, John) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Moda Health Plan, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/21/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant Cochlear Americas, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/21/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Cochlear Americas, Inc.. (Meehan, John) (Filed on 12/24/2019) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/3/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cochlear Americas re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities (Meehan, John) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Cochlear Americas identifying Corporate Parent Cochlear Limited for Cochlear Americas. (Meehan, John) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and Demand for Jury Trial from Del Norte County Superior Court. Their case number is CVPI-2019-1268. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14001482). Filed by Cochlear Americas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant Moda Health Plan, Inc.'s Consent to Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meehan, John) (Filed on 12/20/2019) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Moda Health Plan Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where COCHLEAR AMERICAS CORPORATION is a litigant