This case was last updated from PACER on 12/26/2020 at 09:25:28 (UTC).

Watters v. Evers & Associates of Birmingham

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Watters filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Evers Associates of Birmingham. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karon O Bowdre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01691

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karon O Bowdre

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julius Watters

Defendant

Evers & Associates of Birmingham

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kira Y Fonteneau

Attorney at The Five Points Law Group LLC

2151 Highland Avenue Suite 205

Birmingham, AL 35205

Defendant Attorney

Timothy P Donahue

Attorney at DONAHUE & ASSOCIATES LLC

1020 22Nd Street, South

Birmingham, AL 35205

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/18/2020. (JLC) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Evers & Associates of Birmingham.(Donahue, Timothy) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#6

(#6) Alias Summons Issued as to Evers & Associates of Birmingham. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Julius Watters as to Evers & Associates of Birmingham. (JLC) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Evers & Associates of Birmingham. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Conflict Disclosure Statement by Julius Watters. (JLC) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Julius Watters. (JLC) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

B

1 #1

A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Evers & Associates of Birmingham, filed by Julius Watters. (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Judge Karon O Bowdre on 12/18/2020. (JLC) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Evers & Associates of Birmingham.(Donahue, Timothy) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Alias Summons Issued as to Evers & Associates of Birmingham. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Julius Watters as to Evers & Associates of Birmingham. (JLC) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Evers & Associates of Birmingham. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3703477, NDAL receipt #B4601109308. (Fonteneau, Kira) Modified on 10/27/2020 (JLC). (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Conflict Disclosure Statement by Julius Watters. (JLC) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Julius Watters. (JLC) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Evers & Associates of Birmingham, filed by Julius Watters. (Attachments: #1 A, #2 B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less