Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/28/2020 at 08:59:26 (UTC).

Watson v. Searls et al

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 Watson filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Searls. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence J. Vilardo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00517

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence J. Vilardo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Watson

Defendants

Jeffrey Searls

Thomas E. Feeley

Chad Wolf

William P Barr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig Martin Relles

Attorney at Law Office of Craig Relles

12 Water Street, Suite 303

White Plains, NY 10601

Defendant Attorneys

United States Attorney's Office (e-service)

Attorney at Western District of New York

David M. Coriell

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

138 Delaware Avenue

Buffalo, NY 14202

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) JUDGMENT signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 5/22/2020. (BK) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#12

(#12) DECISION AND ORDER dismissing the petition, Docket Item #1 . The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment and close this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 5/21/2020. (RFI)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 05/21/2020)

11 #1

Exhibit ICE Medical Records

#11

(#11) Letter filed by Charles Watson as to Chad Wolf, Thomas E. Feeley, Jeffrey Searls, William P Barr . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ICE Medical Records)(Relles, Craig) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 Response to Habeas Petition, byWilliam P Barr, Thomas E. Feeley, Jeffrey Searls, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Coriell, David) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#8

(#8) REPLY/RESPONSE to re #7 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Charles Watson. (Relles, Craig) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William P Barr, Thomas E. Feeley, Jeffrey Searls, Chad Wolf. (Coriell, David) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

6 #4

Declaration Exhibit A to Declaration of David M. Coriell

6 #3

Declaration of David M. Coriell

6 #2

Declaration of Capt. Carlos M. Quinones-Ortiz, M.D.

6 #1

Declaration of Jeffrey Searls

#6

(#6) Answer and Return RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William P Barr, Thomas E. Feeley, Jeffrey Searls, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Searls, #2 Declaration of Capt. Carlos M. Quinones-Ortiz, M.D., #3 Declaration of David M. Coriell, #4 Declaration Exhibit A to Declaration of David M. Coriell)(Coriell, David) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit Mr. Watson's COVID-19 Positive Test Result.

#5

(#5) Letter filed by Charles Watson as to Chad Wolf, Thomas E. Feeley, Jeffrey Searls, William P Barr . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mr. Watson's COVID-19 Positive Test Result.)(Relles, Craig) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Coriell on behalf of William P Barr, Thomas E. Feeley, Jeffrey Searls, Chad Wolf (Coriell, David) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#1

(#1) First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0209-3816319.), filed by Charles Watson.(Relles, Craig) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JUDGMENT signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 5/22/2020. (BK) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DECISION AND ORDER dismissing the petition, Docket Item #1 . The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment and close this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 5/21/2020. (RFI)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Letter filed by Charles Watson as to Chad Wolf, Thomas E. Feeley, Jeffrey Searls, William P Barr . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ICE Medical Records)(Relles, Craig) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 Response to Habeas Petition, byWilliam P Barr, Thomas E. Feeley, Jeffrey Searls, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Coriell, David) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo: Oral Argument re: #1 Writ for Habes Corpus held on 5/7/2020. Court directed parties to file additional submissions, as stated on the record, by 5/14/2020. If deemed necessary, the Court will schedule additional oral argument. Court reserved decision. Appearances by teleconference: For petitioner: Craig M. Relles. For respondents: AUSA David M. Coriell. (Court Reporter Ann M. Sawyer.) (CMD) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPLY/RESPONSE to re #7 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Charles Watson. (Relles, Craig) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William P Barr, Thomas E. Feeley, Jeffrey Searls, Chad Wolf. (Coriell, David) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Answer and Return RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by William P Barr, Thomas E. Feeley, Jeffrey Searls, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Searls, #2 Declaration of Capt. Carlos M. Quinones-Ortiz, M.D., #3 Declaration of David M. Coriell, #4 Declaration Exhibit A to Declaration of David M. Coriell)(Coriell, David) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter filed by Charles Watson as to Chad Wolf, Thomas E. Feeley, Jeffrey Searls, William P Barr . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mr. Watson's COVID-19 Positive Test Result.)(Relles, Craig) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Coriell on behalf of William P Barr, Thomas E. Feeley, Jeffrey Searls, Chad Wolf (Coriell, David) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER. The respondents shall file and serve an answer responding to the allegations in the petition on or before Tuesday, May 5, 2020; and it is further ORDERED that on or before Tuesday, May 5, 2020, the respondents shall file and serve, in addition to their answer, a memorandum of law addressing each of the issues raised in the petition and including citations to supporting authority; and it is further ORDERED that on or before Tuesday, May 5, 2020, instead of their answer, the respondents may file a motion to dismiss the petition, accompanied by appropriate exhibits demonstrating that an answer to the petition is unnecessary; and it is further ORDERED that the petitioner shall file a written reply on or before Wednesday, May 6, 2020; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear by telephone for oral argument on Thursday, May 7, 2020, at 3:00 p.m. Public access to the proceeding scheduled for 5/7/2020 at 3:00 PM can be obtained by contacting Judge Vilardo's chambers at (716) 551-1621. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 4/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(RFI) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Charles Watson. to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Charles Watson. (Relles, Craig) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketE-Filing Notification: Attorney is directed to file a civil cover sheet, pursuant to Local Rule 3. No judge assignment will be made until filing is entered on the docket. Please utilize the Continuation of Exhibits event, located within the Responses and Replies category. (CGJ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0209-3816319.), filed by Charles Watson.(Relles, Craig) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig Martin Relles