This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2020 at 09:45:44 (UTC).

Watson v. Medical Data Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/31/2020 Watson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Medical Data Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Curtis L Collier and Cynthia R Wyrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00059

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Curtis L Collier

Referral Judge

Cynthia R Wyrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandra K Watson

Defendant

Medical Data Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan C Lee

Attorney at Alan C. Lee, Attorney

Post Office Box 1357

Talbott, TN 37877-1357

Defendant Attorneys

John H Bedard, Jr

Attorney at Bedard Law Group, PC

4855 River Green Parkway, Suite 310

Duluth, GA 30096

Michael Kevin Chapman

Attorney at Bedard Law Group, PC

4855 River Green Parkway, Suite 310

Duluth, GA 30096

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 2:45 PM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Curtis L Collier. Call-in information will be circulated by email. (CBS) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

12 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

#12

(#12) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 05/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AMP) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#11

(#11) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Medical Data Systems, Inc.. (Chapman, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Medical Data Systems, Inc..(Chapman, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John H Bedard, Jr on behalf of Medical Data Systems, Inc. (Bedard, John) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Kevin Chapman on behalf of Medical Data Systems, Inc. (Chapman, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by Sandra K Watson. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra K Watson. Medical Data Systems, Inc. served on 4/6/2020. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 4/1/2020. (JCK) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 4/1/2020. (JCK) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 4/1/2020. (JCK) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Medical Data Systems, Inc.. (JCK) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

1 #2

Summons - Medical Data Systems

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Medical Data Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4289831.), filed by Sandra K Watson. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Medical Data Systems)(Lee, Alan) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 2:45 PM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Curtis L Collier. Call-in information will be circulated by email. (CBS) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 05/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AMP) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Medical Data Systems, Inc.. (Chapman, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Medical Data Systems, Inc..(Chapman, Michael) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John H Bedard, Jr on behalf of Medical Data Systems, Inc. (Bedard, John) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Kevin Chapman on behalf of Medical Data Systems, Inc. (Chapman, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by Sandra K Watson. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra K Watson. Medical Data Systems, Inc. served on 4/6/2020. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 4/1/2020. (JCK) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 4/1/2020. (JCK) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 4/1/2020. (JCK) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Medical Data Systems, Inc.. (JCK) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (JCK) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Medical Data Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4289831.), filed by Sandra K Watson. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Medical Data Systems)(Lee, Alan) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less