This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2022 at 07:41:20 (UTC).

WATSON v. IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 WATSON filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD A. MCHUGH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00231

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD A. MCHUGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAM WATSON

Defendants

IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC

SC REHAB AND NURSING CENTER, LLC doing business as SOMERTON NURSING AND REHABILITATION CENTER

CHAIM "CHARLIE&q STEG

CHAIM CHARLIE STEG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARI RISSON KARPF

Attorney at KARPF, KARPF & CERUTTI, P.C.

3331 Street Road

Two Greenwood Square, SU 128

W. CHARLES SIPIO

Attorney at KARPF KARPF & CERUTTI P.C.

3331 Street Road

Two Greenwood Square, SU 128

ALLISON AILEEN BARKER

Attorney at KARPF KARPF & CERUTTI PC

3331 Street Rd, Two Greenwood Sq Suite 128

Bensalem, PA 19020

Defendant Attorneys

ELIZABETH BUTLER

Attorney at KAUFMAN BORGEEST & RYANN LLP

9 Campus Drive, Suite101

Parsippany, NJ 07054

Diana-Marie Laventure

Attorney at Kaufman, Borgeest & Ryan

9 Campus Drive, Ste 101

Parsippany, NJ 07054

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC, SC REHAB AND NURSING CENTER, LLC, CHAIM "CHARLIE&q STEG ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15670541.), filed by WILLIAM WATSON.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by W. CHARLES SIPIO on behalf of WILLIAM WATSON (SIPIO, W.) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON AILEEN BARKER on behalf of WILLIAM WATSON (BARKER, ALLISON) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WILLIAM WATSON. IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC waiver sent on 1/19/2022, answer due 3/21/2022; SC REHAB AND NURSING CENTER, LLC waiver sent on 1/19/2022, answer due 3/21/2022; CHAIM CHARLIE STEG waiver sent on 1/19/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15772838.) filed by IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC, SC REHAB AND NURSING CENTER, LLC, CHAIM CHARLIE STEG..(Laventure, Diana-Marie) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER THAT MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ELIZABETH BUTLER IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 3/8/22. 3/8/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER THAT MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ELIZABETH BUTLER IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 3/8/22. 3/8/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15772838.) filed by IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC, SC REHAB AND NURSING CENTER, LLC, CHAIM CHARLIE STEG..(Laventure, Diana-Marie) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WILLIAM WATSON. IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC waiver sent on 1/19/2022, answer due 3/21/2022; SC REHAB AND NURSING CENTER, LLC waiver sent on 1/19/2022, answer due 3/21/2022; CHAIM CHARLIE STEG waiver sent on 1/19/2022, answer due 3/21/2022. (KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by ALLISON AILEEN BARKER on behalf of WILLIAM WATSON (BARKER, ALLISON) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by W. CHARLES SIPIO on behalf of WILLIAM WATSON (SIPIO, W.) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC, SC REHAB AND NURSING CENTER, LLC, CHAIM CHARLIE STEG AND EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL (rf, ) (Entered: 01/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by WILLIAM WATSON. (JL) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC, SC REHAB AND NURSING CENTER, LLC, CHAIM "CHARLIE&q STEG ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15670541.), filed by WILLIAM WATSON.(KARPF, ARI) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC is a litigant