This case was last updated from PACER on 11/06/2020 at 07:40:54 (UTC).

Watson v. Homebridge Financial Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2020 Watson filed an Other lawsuit against Homebridge Financial Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is George Jarrod Hazel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02578

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Jarrod Hazel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAISHA WATSON

Defendant

Homebridge Financial Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Courtney Weiner

Attorney at Law Office of Courtney Weiner PLLC

1629 K St., Nw, Suite 300

Washington, MD 20006

Defendant Attorney

Aaron A Wagner

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

1000 Second Avenue, Suite 3500

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Supplemental, #1 Complaint, by Homebridge Financial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wagner, Aaron) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron A Wagner on behalf of Homebridge Financial Services, Inc. (Wagner, Aaron) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Homebridge Financial Services, Inc..(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Supplemental to #1 Complaint, filed by Daisha Watson Exhibit 2 (Weiner, Courtney) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit 5

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 4

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 1

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Homebridge Financial Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8848109.), filed by DAISHA WATSON. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Weiner, Courtney) (Entered: 09/07/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 10/26/2020. (jw2s, Chambers) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Supplemental, #1 Complaint, by Homebridge Financial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wagner, Aaron) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron A Wagner on behalf of Homebridge Financial Services, Inc. (Wagner, Aaron) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued 21 days as to Homebridge Financial Services, Inc..(ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Supplemental to #1 Complaint, filed by Daisha Watson Exhibit 2 (Weiner, Courtney) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Homebridge Financial Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8848109.), filed by DAISHA WATSON. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Weiner, Courtney) (Entered: 09/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less