This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/30/2020 at 08:46:18 (UTC).

Watson v. FCA US, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/01/2020 Watson filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark A. Goldsmith, David R. Grand, Judith E. Levy and R. Steven Whalen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-11069

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Mark A. Goldsmith

Judith E. Levy

Referral Judges

David R. Grand

R. Steven Whalen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicolette Watson

Defendant

FCA US, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel O. Herrera

Attorney at Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP

150 South Wacker Drive, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60606

Patrick E. Cafferty

Attorney at Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP

220 Collingwood Drive, Suite 130

Ann Arbor, MI 48103

Matthew D. Schelkopf

Attorney at Sauder Schelkopf LLC

555 Lancaster Avenue

Berwyn, PA 19312

Defendant Attorneys

Patrick G. Seyferth

Attorney at Bush, Seyferth & Paige

100 W. Big Beaver Road, Suite 400

Troy, MI 48084-3107

Stephen A. D'Aunoy

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

One Us Bank Plaza

Saint Louis, MO 63101

Kathy A. Wisniewski

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

One Us Bank Plaza, 26Th Floor

St. Louis, MO 63101

Brandi L. Burke

Attorney at Thompson Coburn LLP

One U.S. Bank Plaza

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

1 #10

Exhibit 9

1 #9

Exhibit 8

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Index of Exhibits

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to #1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 8/10/2020, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATED ORDER Extending Time for Defendant to Answer #1 Complaint; Responsive Pleading due by 6/26/2020, Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (WBar) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand in Detroit to District Judge Judith E. Levy and Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen in Ann Arbor. (NAhm) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick G. Seyferth on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Seyferth, Patrick) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by FCA US, LLC identifying Corporate Parent FCA North America Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V., Other Affiliate FCA Holdco B.V. for FCA US, LLC. (D'Aunoy, Stephen) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen A. D'Aunoy appearing on behalf of FCA US, LLC (D'Aunoy, Stephen) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Kathy A. Wisniewski appearing on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Wisniewski, Kathy) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brandi L. Burke appearing on behalf of FCA US, LLC (Burke, Brandi) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. Schelkopf on behalf of Nicolette Watson. (Schelkopf, Matthew) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. FCA US, LLC served on 5/7/2020, answer due 5/28/2020. (Herrera, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *FCA US, LLC* (SOso) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketREQUEST for SUMMONS for FCA US, LLC. (Cafferty, Patrick) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick E. Cafferty on behalf of Nicolette Watson. (Cafferty, Patrick) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Nicolette Watson against FCA US, LLC with Jury Demand. No summons requested. Receipt No: AMIEDC-7776659 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Pinelles - County Where Action Arose: Out of State - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Ann Arbor, 5:20-cv-11054-JEL-APP, Judge Judith E. Levy] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9) (Herrera, Daniel) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick G. Seyferth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandi L. Burke

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathy A. Wisniewski