This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2022 at 08:01:40 (UTC).

Watson v. 3M Company et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 Watson filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Louis Guirola, Jr, Robert H Walker, Kristi H. Johnson and Robert P. Myers, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00145

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Louis Guirola, Jr

Kristi H. Johnson

Referral Judges

Robert H Walker

Robert P. Myers, Jr

 

Party Details

Defendants

3M Company

Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC

Bayer Samson II LLC

Lockheed Martin Corporation sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Martin Marietta doing business as Lockheed Martin Aeronautics formerly known as Lockheed Martin Tactical Systems

Lorillard LLC

Morse Tec LLC

Occidental Chemical Corporation

Philadelphia Gear Corporation

Unisys Corporation

Velan Valve Corp.

ViacomCBS, Inc.

Viad Corp.

Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.

Block Drug Company, Inc.

Block Drug Corporation

Brenntag Specialties LLC

Cameron International Corporation

Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Davis Engineering Company formerly known as Aqua-Chem, Inc. doing business as Cleaver-Brooks Division

Compudyne LLC

Cosmetic Specialities, Inc.

136 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

J. William Manuel

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS, LLP - Jackson

P.O. Box 1789, 188 E. Capitol Street, Suite 1000 (39201)

Jackson, MS 39215-1789

Stevie F. Rushing

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS, LLP - Jackson

P.O. Box 1789, 188 E. Capitol Street, Suite 1000 (39201)

Jackson, MS 39215-1789

Samuel D. Habeeb

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC - Ridgeland

1020 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Robert W. Wilkinson

Attorney at WILKINSON, WILLIAMS, BOSIO & SESSOMS, PLLC - Pascagoula

734 Delmas Avenue (39567), Post Office Box 1618

Pascagoula, MS 39568-1618

Brian T. Clark - PHV

Attorney at GLAZIER YEE, LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 2025

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Scott A. Kossoudji - PHV

Attorney at GLAZIER YEE, LLP

707 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 2025

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Bradley Adam Hays

Attorney at MANION GAYNOR MANNING, LLP

1700 South 28Th Ave., Suite D

Hattiesburg, MS 39402

John D. Cosmich

Attorney at COSMICH, SIMMONS & BROWN, PLLC - Jackson

P. O. Box 22626, One Eastover Center

Jackson, MS 39225-2626

Cecelia Virden

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC - Ridgeland

1020 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Charles (Chan) E. McLeod

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC - Ridgeland

1020 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

John C. McCants, III

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC - Ridgeland

1020 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Kimberly Paige Mangum

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC - Ridgeland

1020 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Other Attorneys

Corban Gunn

Attorney at CORBAN GUNN, PLLC

175 Lameuse Street, Suite C, P. O. Box 1466 (39533)

Biloxi, MS 39530

Meade W. Mitchell

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP-Ridgeland

P. O. Box 6010, 1020 Highland Colony Pkwy., Ste. 1400 (39157)

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Keith D. Obert

Attorney at OBERT LAW GROUP, PA

750 Avignon Drive, Suite 1

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Colleen S. Welch

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC - Ridgeland

1020 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Kalleigh A. McCoy

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY ANDERSON & TARDY, LLC - Ridgeland

1020 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

Katie R. Van Camp

Attorney at DANIEL, COKER, HORTON & BELL - Gulfport

P. O. Box 416, 1712 15Th Street, Suite 400 (39501)

Gulfport, MS 39502-0416

James Gordon House, III

Attorney at COSMICH, SIMMONS & BROWN, PLLC - Jackson

P. O. Box 22626, One Eastover Center

Jackson, MS 39225-2626

Mark J. Goldberg

Attorney at COSMICH, SIMMONS & BROWN, PLLC - Jackson

P. O. Box 22626, One Eastover Center

Jackson, MS 39225-2626

61 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#301

(#301) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Occidental Chemical Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent OXY USA Inc., Corporate Parent Occidental Petroleum Corporation for Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Bufkin, Thomas) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#300

(#300) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. for all further proceedings Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 8/5/2022 (wld) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

299 #4

Exhibit D - Suggestion of Death

299 #3

Exhibit C - Order Admit Will Probate Grant Letters Testamentary

299 #2

Exhibit B - Watson Death Certificate

299 #1

Exhibit A - Filed Stamped State Court Complaint (pg. 1 only)

299 #299

Main Document

242 #4

Exhibit D - 1962 MIL-STD-129C

242 #2

Exhibit B - Excerpts 1946 Warning Labels Guide

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by General Electric Company.(Jones, Sarah) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co. (Wilkinson, Robert) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Wilkinson on behalf of Crane Co. (Wilkinson, Robert) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Autumn T. Breeden on behalf of Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. (Breeden, Autumn) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Crump on behalf of Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. (Crump, Richard) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lockheed Martin Corporation (Wilkinson, Robert) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Lower Court Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

410 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#301) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Occidental Chemical Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent OXY USA Inc., Corporate Parent Occidental Petroleum Corporation for Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Bufkin, Thomas) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketParties should use the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials on future filings. 1:22cv145KHJ-RPM. (wld) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#300) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr. for all further proceedings Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 8/5/2022 (wld) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#299) MOTION to Substitute Party by Allan Watson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed Stamped State Court Complaint (pg. 1 only), #2 Exhibit B - Watson Death Certificate, #3 Exhibit C - Order Admit Will Probate Grant Letters Testamentary, #4 Exhibit D - Suggestion of Death)(Gunn, Corban) (Entered: 08/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#298) REPLY to Response to Motion re #242 MOTION to Remand Reply to Responses to Motion to Remand [ECF Nos. 271; 273; 274] filed by Allan Watson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Filed Stamped State Court Complaint (pg. 1 only)), #2 Exhibit 2 - Watson Death Certificate, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plf Filed Sugggestion of Death, #4 Exhibit 4 - Filed Order Probate Will Letters Testamentary)(Gunn, Corban) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#297) RESPONSE to Motion re #153 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Allan Watson (Gunn, Corban) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#296) RESPONSE to Motion re #157 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Allan Watson (Gunn, Corban) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #284 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses and #286 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply. Responses and Reply due by 8/5/2022. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by District Judge Kristi H. Johnson on 8/4/2022. (ANT) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #295 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. The deadline for Premier Brands of America, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is 8/25/2022. NO FURTHER ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bradley W. Rath on 8/4/22 (HM) (Entered: 08/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#295) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Premier Brands of America, Inc. (Millette, Clare) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
331 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Margaret Gay on behalf of General Electric Company (Gay, Mary Margaret) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Jones on behalf of General Electric Company (Jones, Sarah) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Jones, Sarah) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by General Electric Company.(Jones, Sarah) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co. (Wilkinson, Robert) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Wilkinson on behalf of Crane Co. (Wilkinson, Robert) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Autumn T. Breeden on behalf of Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. (Breeden, Autumn) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Crump on behalf of Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc. (Crump, Richard) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lockheed Martin Corporation (Wilkinson, Robert) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with lower court jury demand by Lockheed Martin Corporation from Jackson County Circuit Court, case number 2022-003.AS. (Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 203) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lower Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCH) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DR. SCHOLL'S LLC a/k/a BAYER SAMSON II LLC; is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPUDYNE CORP (SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN is a litigant

Latest cases where UNISYS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where COSMETIC SPECIALTIES INC. FDBA G&G SPECIALTY PRODUCTS CO. is a litigant