This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2021 at 07:31:37 (UTC).

Self-Insured Schools of California v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 Self-Insured Schools of California filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucy H. Koh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lucy H. Koh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Self-Insured Schools of California

Defendants

Lupin Ltd.

Endo Pharmaceuticals LLC

Mallinckrodt LLC

Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Ranbaxy Laboratories LTD

Mallinckrodt PLC

Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC

Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC

Sun Pharmaceuticals Holdings USA, Inc

Endo International plc

Lupin Inc.

Eurohealth (USA), Inc.

Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd

Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC

Roxane Laboratories, Inc.

Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven Noel Williams

Joseph R. Saveri

Kyle Paul Quackenbush

Christopher Kar-Lun Young

Anupama K. Reddy

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Bradshaw

Monsura A. Sirajee

Stephen McIntyre

Brett Johnston Williamson

Benjamin M Greenblum

Gilad Bendheim

Devora Whitman Allon

Jay Philip Lefkowitz

Jack Pace

Kathryn Jordan Mims

 

Court Documents

#60

#59

#58

#57

#56

#55

#54

53 #1

*Restricted*

#53

#52

#51

#50

49 #4

Text of Proposed Order

49 #3

VA Certificate of Good Standing

49 #2

DC Certificate of Good Standing

49 #1

Affidavit

#49

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Kar-Lun Young (Young, Christopher) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Wockhardt Ltd, Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., & Wockhardt USA LLC by Self-Insured Schools of California (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Certificate of Interested Entities by Self-Insured Schools of California (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/13/2021) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE of Appearance by Anupama K. Reddy (Reddy, Anupama) (Filed on 1/12/2021) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Paul Quackenbush (Quackenbush, Kyle) (Filed on 1/12/2021) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Noel Williams (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/12/2021) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Saveri (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/12/2021) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:20-cv-06495. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketMDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (sjo) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/29/2020) (sjo) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Nelson Stephen Roman as possibly related to 20cv6003. (pc) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven N. Williams. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand blank;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000;. (pc) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven N. Williams. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Self-Insured Schools of California, Watson Laboratories, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS PLC; JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.; JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED; HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS PLC; EUROHEALTH (USA), INC; HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.; WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.; ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC.; AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.; LUPIN LTD.; LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC; LUPIN INC.; SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.; SUN PHARMACEUTICAL HOLDINGS USA, INC; SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.; RANBAXY LABORATORIES LTD.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.; WATSON LABORATORIES, INC; WOCKHARDT LTD.; MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC,; WOCKHARDT USA LLC; MALLINCKRODT PLC; MALLINCKRODT LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven) Modified on 8/17/2020 (pc). (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 7:20-cv-06003-NSR. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals LLC, Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals, PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Roxane Laboratories, Inc., Sun Pharmaceuticals Holdings USA, Inc, Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd, Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals, Corp., Wockhardt Ltd., Wockhardt USA LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21167193)Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less