This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2021 at 07:31:37 (UTC).

Self-Insured Schools of California v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 Self-Insured Schools of California filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucy H. Koh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lucy H. Koh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Self-Insured Schools of California

Defendants

Lupin Ltd.

Endo Pharmaceuticals LLC

Mallinckrodt LLC

Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Ranbaxy Laboratories LTD

Mallinckrodt PLC

Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC

Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC

Sun Pharmaceuticals Holdings USA, Inc

Endo International plc

Lupin Inc.

Eurohealth (USA), Inc.

Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd

Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC

Roxane Laboratories, Inc.

Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven Noel Williams

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm

601 California Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94108

Joseph R. Saveri

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.

601 California Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94108

Kyle Paul Quackenbush

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm

601 California St., Ste 1000

San Francisco, CA 94108

Christopher Kar-Lun Young

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.

601 California Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94108

Anupama K. Reddy

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm

601 California Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94109

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Bradshaw

Attorney at O'Melveny & Meyers LLP

1625 Eye Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Monsura A. Sirajee

Attorney at O'Melveny and Myers

1999 Avenue Of The Stars

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Stephen McIntyre

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP (LA2)

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Brett Johnston Williamson

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

610 Newport Center Drive, 17Th Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660-6429

Benjamin M Greenblum

Attorney at Williams and Connolly LLP

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Gilad Bendheim

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Devora Whitman Allon

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NYC)

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Jay Philip Lefkowitz

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NYC)

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Jack Pace

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY)

1221 Ave Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Kathryn Jordan Mims

Attorney at White & Case

701 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Brendan Jasper Coffman

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati

1700 K Street, Nw, Fifth Floor

Washington, DC 20006

Jeffrey C. Bank

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati

1301 Avenue Of The Americas, 40Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#60

#59

#58

#57

#56

#55

#54

53 #1

*Restricted*

#53

#52

#51

#50

49 #4

Text of Proposed Order

49 #3

VA Certificate of Good Standing

49 #2

DC Certificate of Good Standing

49 #1

Affidavit

#49

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Kar-Lun Young (Young, Christopher) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Wockhardt Ltd, Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., & Wockhardt USA LLC by Self-Insured Schools of California (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/27/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Certificate of Interested Entities by Self-Insured Schools of California (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/13/2021) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE of Appearance by Anupama K. Reddy (Reddy, Anupama) (Filed on 1/12/2021) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Paul Quackenbush (Quackenbush, Kyle) (Filed on 1/12/2021) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Noel Williams (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/12/2021) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Saveri (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 1/12/2021) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:20-cv-06495. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketMDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (sjo) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/29/2020) (sjo) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Nelson Stephen Roman as possibly related to 20cv6003. (pc) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven N. Williams. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand blank;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000;. (pc) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven N. Williams. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Self-Insured Schools of California, Watson Laboratories, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS PLC; JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.; JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED; HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS PLC; EUROHEALTH (USA), INC; HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.; WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.; ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC.; AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.; LUPIN LTD.; LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC; LUPIN INC.; SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.; SUN PHARMACEUTICAL HOLDINGS USA, INC; SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.; RANBAXY LABORATORIES LTD.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.; WATSON LABORATORIES, INC; WOCKHARDT LTD.; MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC,; WOCKHARDT USA LLC; MALLINCKRODT PLC; MALLINCKRODT LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven) Modified on 8/17/2020 (pc). (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 7:20-cv-06003-NSR. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals LLC, Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals, PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Roxane Laboratories, Inc., Sun Pharmaceuticals Holdings USA, Inc, Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd, Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals, Corp., Wockhardt Ltd., Wockhardt USA LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21167193)Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUN PHARMACEUTICAL HOLDINGS USA INC A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where Roxane Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant