This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2021 at 14:14:08 (UTC).

Self-Insured Schools of California v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 Self-Insured Schools of California filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelson Stephen Roman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:20-CV-06495

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelson Stephen Roman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Self-Insured Schools of California

Defendants

Lupin Ltd.

Endo Pharmaceuticals LLC

Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc

Hikma Pharmaceuticals, PLC

Mallinckrodt LLC

Mallinckrodt plc

Wockhardt Ltd.

Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC

Sun Pharmaceuticals Holdings USA, Inc

Endo International PLC

Lupin Inc.

Eurohealth (USA), Inc.

Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

West-Ward Pharmaceuticals, Corp.

Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC

Roxane Laboratories, Inc.

Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc.

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven N. Williams

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm

601 California Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94104

Kyle Quackenbush

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.

601 California Street, Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94108

Joseph Richard Saveri

Attorney at Joseph Saveri Law Firm, Inc.

601 California St., Suite 1000

San Francisco, CA 94108

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen McIntyre

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP (LA2)

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Monsura A. Sirajee

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars, 8Th Floor, Ste 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Benjamin Bradshaw

Attorney at O'Melveny & Meyers LLP

1625 Eye Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Brett Johnston Williamson

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers, LLP(NYC)

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Benjamin M. Greenblum

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP (DC)

725 Twelfth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Brendan J Coffman

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

1700 K Street, Nw, Ste Fifth Floor

Washington, DC 20006

Jeffrey C. Bank

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati (NYC)

1301 Avenue Of The Americas, 40Th Fl

New York, NY 10019

Jay Philip Lefkowitz

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NYC)

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Devora Whitman Allon

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NYC)

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Gilad Bendheim

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NYC)

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Jack Pace

Attorney at White & Case LLP (NY)

1221 Ave Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Kathryn Jordan Mims

Attorney at White & Case

701 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#52

#51

#50

49 #4

Text of Proposed Order

49 #3

VA Certificate of Good Standing

49 #2

DC Certificate of Good Standing

49 #1

Affidavit

#49

48 #3

Text of Proposed Order

48 #2

CA - Certificate of Good Standing

48 #1

Declaration of Monsura A. Sirajee

#48

47 #3

Text of Proposed Order

47 #2

CA - Certificate of Good Standing

47 #1

Declaration of Stephen J. McIntyre

#47

78 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketReceived e-mail from the United States District Court - Northern District of California acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 5:21-cv-00020, filed on 01/04/2021. (sjo) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketMDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (sjo) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Northern District of California. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/29/2020) (sjo) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 7:20-cv-06003-NSR. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY upon the record as to Mallinckrodt LLC and Mallinckrodt plc . Document filed by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc.(Willis, Jane) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #49 AMENDED MOTION for BRENDAN J. COFFMAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) AMENDED MOTION for BRENDAN J. COFFMAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Wockhardt Ltd., Wockhardt USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Coffman, Brendan) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Nelson Stephen Roman as possibly related to 20cv6003. (pc) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven N. Williams. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand blank;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,000,000;. (pc) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven N. Williams. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Self-Insured Schools of California, Watson Laboratories, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS PLC; JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.; JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED; HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS PLC; EUROHEALTH (USA), INC; HIKMA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.; WEST-WARD PHARMACEUTICALS CORP.; ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC.; AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; ENDO INTERNATIONAL, PLC; ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS LLC; PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.; LUPIN LTD.; LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC; LUPIN INC.; SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.; SUN PHARMACEUTICAL HOLDINGS USA, INC; SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.; RANBAXY LABORATORIES LTD.; TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD.; WATSON LABORATORIES, INC; WOCKHARDT LTD.; MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC,; WOCKHARDT USA LLC; MALLINCKRODT PLC; MALLINCKRODT LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven) Modified on 8/17/2020 (pc). (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 7:20-cv-06003-NSR. Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals LLC, Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals, PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ranbaxy Laboratories Ltd., Roxane Laboratories, Inc., Sun Pharmaceuticals Holdings USA, Inc, Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd, Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Watson Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals, Corp., Wockhardt Ltd., Wockhardt USA LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21167193)Document filed by Self-Insured Schools of California..(Williams, Steven) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less