This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/20/2022 at 07:34:42 (UTC).

Watson et al v. Oxford Community School District et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2022 Watson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Oxford Community School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark A. Goldsmith and Anthony P. Patti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-11959

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A. Goldsmith

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jarrod Watson

Linda Watson

A. W.

Defendants

Oxford Community School District

Timothy Throne

Steven Wolf

Nicholas Ejak

Pam Parker Fine

Shawn Hopkins

Kimberly Potts

Kenneth Weaver

Interested Parties

Matthew Turner

Southfield, MI 48076

Lisa M. Esser

Southfield, MI 48076

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd F. Flood

Attorney at Flood Law, PLLC

155 West Congress, Ste 603

Detroit, MI 48226

Defendant Attorneys

Annabel F. Shea

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.

101 West Big Beaver Road, 10Th Floor

Troy, MI 48084

John L. Miller

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins,

101 W. Big Beaver Road

Troy, MI 48084

Kenneth B. Chapie

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.

10Th Floor Columbia Center, 101 West Big Beaver Rd.

Troy, MI 48084-5280

Timothy J. Mullins

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.

101 W. Big Beaver Rd., 10Th Floor

Troy, MI 48084

Interested Party Attorneys

Matthew L. Turner

Attorney at Sommers Schwartz, P.C.

One Towne Square, Suite 1700

Southfield, MI 48076

Lisa M. Esser

Attorney at Sommers Schwartz, P.C.

One Towne Square, Ste 1700

Southfield, MI 48076

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: BMIEDC-9025032 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): EDMI, 2:21-cv-12871-MAG-APP, Judge Hon. Mark A. Goldsmith] (Flood, Todd) (Entered: 08/21/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Shalina D. Kumar, Magistrate Judge David R. Grand to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (JOwe) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER Regarding Filings. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 9/22/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (KSan) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of All Defendants. (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth B. Chapie on behalf of All Defendants. (Chapie, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Annabel F. Shea on behalf of All Defendants. (Shea, Annabel) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Miller on behalf of All Defendants. (Miller, John) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#11

(#11) COMMON ORDER Regarding Motions on Qualified Immunity. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Flood, Todd) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

#13

(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Pre-Facilitation Discovery. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#14

(#14) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Turner on behalf of Matthew Turner. (Turner, Matthew) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Esser on behalf of Lisa M. Esser. (Esser, Lisa) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Esser on behalf of Lisa M. Esser. (Esser, Lisa) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Turner on behalf of Matthew Turner. (Turner, Matthew) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Pre-Facilitation Discovery. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Flood, Todd) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) COMMON ORDER Regarding Motions on Qualified Immunity. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Miller on behalf of All Defendants. (Miller, John) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Annabel F. Shea on behalf of All Defendants. (Shea, Annabel) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth B. Chapie on behalf of All Defendants. (Chapie, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of All Defendants. (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Status Conference held on 9/22/2022 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (KSan) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 9/22/2022 10:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (KSan) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Regarding Filings. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) (Entered: 08/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Shalina D. Kumar, Magistrate Judge David R. Grand to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (JOwe) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: BMIEDC-9025032 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): EDMI, 2:21-cv-12871-MAG-APP, Judge Hon. Mark A. Goldsmith] (Flood, Todd) (Entered: 08/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew L Turner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa Michelle Esser