This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/20/2022 at 07:08:54 (UTC).

Watley v. Target Corporation

Case Summary

On 11/21/2021 Watley filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cecilia M. Altonaga and Edwin G. Torres. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-24098

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

Referral Judge

Edwin G. Torres

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandon Watley

Defendant

Target Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory A. Deutch

Attorney at Rubenstein Law

9155 South Dadeland Blvd.Suite 1600

Miami, FL 33156

Mariano Ariel Corcilli

Attorney at The Corcilli Law Firm

28 West Flaglersuite 600

Miami, FL 33130

Defendant Attorneys

Andres Alejandro Pino

Attorney at Hamilton, Miller & Birthisel, LLP

150 Southeast 2Nd Avenueste 1200

Miami, FL 33131

Schuyler Analise Smith

Attorney at Hamilton, Miller & Birthisel LLP

150 Se 2 Avenuesuite #1200

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Target Corporation DE 25 Notice of Taking Deposition (Smith, Schuyler) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#25

(#25) MOTION to Take Deposition from Brandon Watley by Target Corporation. (Smith, Schuyler) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Compliance by Brandon Watley re 23 Notice re Hearing, (Deutch, Gregory) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Manuel Morales as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 5/24/2022 @ 2pm. (Morales, Manuel) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#21

(#21) ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Manuel Morales. Mediation Hearing set for 5/24/2022 02:00 PM. The parties are reminded that a report of the mediation is due within seven (7) days of the mediation conference. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

20 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order setting mediation

20 #20

Main Document

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory A. Deutch on behalf of Brandon Watley. Attorney Gregory A. Deutch added to party Brandon Watley(pty:pla). (Deutch, Gregory) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#18

(#18) ORDER that on or before December 28, 2021, the parties shall submit a proposed order scheduling mediation in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, failing which the case will be dismissed without prejudice without further notice. Furthermore, in their written submission, the parties shall explain why they failed to comply with the December 2, 2021 Order, necessitating this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

1 #9

Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit Filings in State Court

1 #7

Exhibit Plaintiff's medical records

1 #5

Exhibit Defendant's 2021 Annual Report from Florida Department of State

1 #4

Exhibit Plaintiff's medical bills

1 #3

Exhibit Plaintiff's service of process

1 #2

Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint in State court

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Target Corporation DE 25 Notice of Taking Deposition (Smith, Schuyler) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION to Take Deposition from Brandon Watley by Target Corporation. (Smith, Schuyler) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Compliance by Brandon Watley re 23 Notice re Hearing, (Deutch, Gregory) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Docket(#23) PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: A Discovery Hearing is set for 1/27/2022 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. This hearing will take place in person at the United States Courthouse, James Lawrence King Building, Courtroom 5 - Tenth Floor, 99 N.E. 4th Street, Miami, Florida. All persons attending the hearing will be subject to the Court's latest COVID Order and guidelines. (jfz) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Manuel Morales as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 5/24/2022 @ 2pm. (Morales, Manuel) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Manuel Morales. Mediation Hearing set for 5/24/2022 02:00 PM. The parties are reminded that a report of the mediation is due within seven (7) days of the mediation conference. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Compliance by Brandon Watley re #18 Order to Show Cause,, (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order setting mediation) (Deutch, Gregory) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory A. Deutch on behalf of Brandon Watley. Attorney Gregory A. Deutch added to party Brandon Watley(pty:pla). (Deutch, Gregory) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER that on or before December 28, 2021, the parties shall submit a proposed order scheduling mediation in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, failing which the case will be dismissed without prejudice without further notice. Furthermore, in their written submission, the parties shall explain why they failed to comply with the December 2, 2021 Order, necessitating this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Clerks Notice to Filer re #16 Notice (Other). Parties/Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties/mediator. (pcs) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Target Corporation re #3 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines of Filing State Court Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court docket) (Smith, Schuyler) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATUS REPORT Removal by Target Corporation (Smith, Schuyler) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Target Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed scheduling Order)(Smith, Schuyler) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint Notice and NON-CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge . Filed by Target Corporation (Smith, Schuyler) (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation (Smith, Schuyler) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andres Alejandro Pino on behalf of Target Corporation (Pino, Andres) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 12/2/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER. Removal Status Report due by 12/2/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Brandon Watley v. Target Corporation) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15190305, filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint in State court, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's service of process, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's medical bills, #5 Exhibit Defendant's 2021 Annual Report from Florida Department of State, #6 Exhibit Demand letter, #7 Exhibit Plaintiff's medical records, #8 Exhibit Filings in State Court, #9 Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet)(Smith, Schuyler) State Court Answer filed. Modified on 11/22/2021 (pcs). (Entered: 11/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schuyler Analise Smith