This case was last updated from PACER on 03/15/2021 at 10:20:46 (UTC).

WATKINS v. WETZEL et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 WATKINS filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against WETZEL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL H. SLOMSKY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00293

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL H. SLOMSKY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRYAN WATKINS

Dallas, PA 18612

Defendants

KEVIN RANSOM

WELLPATH

JORGE DOMINIC

DR. PRINCE

JOHN E. WETZEL

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT OF FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. THE MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS SHALL BE LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 1/26/21. 1/26/21 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO PRO SE(JL) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#4

(#4) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#3

RESTRICTED

2 #1

Designation Form

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against JORGE DOMINIC, PRINCE, KEVIN RANSOM, WELLPATH, JOHN E. WETZEL, filed by BRYAN WATKINS. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form)(bw, ) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOriginal record transferred to the Middle to District of Pennsylvania via Interdistrict transfer system. (tjd) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketMAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #5 TO PLAINTIFF ON 1/26/21. (jaa, ) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT OF FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. THE MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS SHALL BE LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 1/26/21. 1/26/21 ENTERED AND NOT MAILED TO PRO SE(JL) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPRO SE GUIDELINES HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, WATKINS. (bw, ) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by BRYAN WATKINS. (bw, ) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against JORGE DOMINIC, PRINCE, KEVIN RANSOM, WELLPATH, JOHN E. WETZEL, filed by BRYAN WATKINS. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form)(bw, ) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by BRYAN WATKINS..(bw, ) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRINCE INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where Wellpath LLC is a litigant