This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2019 at 07:57:06 (UTC).

Watkins v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 Watkins filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02911

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taylor Watkins

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian M. Caplan

Attorney at Sawaya Law Firm

1600 Ogden Street

Denver, CO 80218

Defendant Attorneys

Evan Bennett Stephenson

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

Kayla L. Scroggins-Uptigrove

Attorney at Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP-Denver

370 17Th Street, Suite 4500

Denver, CO 80202-5647

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company All parties consent.. (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Rule Against Claim Splitting and the Colorado River Doctrine filed by Plaintiff Taylor Watkins. (Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

12 #8

Exhibit H - Order 9-5-19

12 #7

Exhibit G - State Farm Response Motion to Reconsider

12 #6

Exhibit F - Motion to Reconsider

12 #5

Exhibit E - Order 7-5-19

12 #4

Exhibit D - State Farm Response Motion to Amend

12 #3

Exhibit C - Motion to Amend Complaint

12 #2

Exhibit B - Second Amended Complaint Watkins v. Townsend

12 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint Watkins v. Townsend

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Rule Against Claim Splitting and the Colorado River Doctrine by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint Watkins v. Townsend, #2 Exhibit B - Second Amended Complaint Watkins v. Townsend, #3 Exhibit C - Motion to Amend Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - State Farm Response Motion to Amend, #5 Exhibit E - Order 7-5-19, #6 Exhibit F - Motion to Reconsider, #7 Exhibit G - State Farm Response Motion to Reconsider, #8 Exhibit H - Order 9-5-19)(Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

10 #1

Docket Sheet State Court Docket 10-22-19

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet State Court Docket 10-22-19)(Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Brian Caplan by Brian M. Caplan on behalf of Taylor WatkinsAttorney Brian M. Caplan added to party Taylor Watkins(pty:pla) (Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Kayla Scroggins-Uptigrove by Kayla L. Scroggins-Uptigrove on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Kayla L. Scroggins-Uptigrove added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER Scheduling Conference for 12/18/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 12/4/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/11/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/15/2019. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #14 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/4/2019. Text Only Entry. (sphil, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company All parties consent.. (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Rule Against Claim Splitting and the Colorado River Doctrine filed by Plaintiff Taylor Watkins. (Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to the Rule Against Claim Splitting and the Colorado River Doctrine by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint Watkins v. Townsend, #2 Exhibit B - Second Amended Complaint Watkins v. Townsend, #3 Exhibit C - Motion to Amend Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - State Farm Response Motion to Amend, #5 Exhibit E - Order 7-5-19, #6 Exhibit F - Motion to Reconsider, #7 Exhibit G - State Farm Response Motion to Reconsider, #8 Exhibit H - Order 9-5-19)(Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet State Court Docket 10-22-19)(Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Brian Caplan by Brian M. Caplan on behalf of Taylor WatkinsAttorney Brian M. Caplan added to party Taylor Watkins(pty:pla) (Caplan, Brian) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Kayla Scroggins-Uptigrove by Kayla L. Scroggins-Uptigrove on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Kayla L. Scroggins-Uptigrove added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Scheduling Conference for 12/18/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 12/4/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/11/2019, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/15/2019. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • (#4) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATE COURT ORDER granting Defendant State Farm's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, signed by Boulder County District Judge Judith Labuda on 10 October, 2019. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Civil COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Taylor Watkins.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Boulder County District Court, Case Number 19-cv-30881. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6942354), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Disclosures, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 State Court - Civil Complaint and Jury Demand, #4 State Court - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #5 State Court - Summons, #6 State Court - Waiver and Acceptance of Service, #7 State Court - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant