This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/23/2021 at 07:45:59 (UTC).

Watkins v. Floor & Decor

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 Watkins filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Floor Decor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN R. PADOVA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03764

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN R. PADOVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tyra Watkins

Defendant

Floor & Decor

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TYLER TOMLINSON

Attorney at STARK & STARK, P.C.

777 Township Line Road, Suite 120

Yardley, PA 19067

Defendant Attorney

ANDREW C. GOLDSTEIN

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

2000 Market Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Notice

4 #2

Scheduling Info Report

#5

#6

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

CONSENT FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice Re: Arbitration Videoconference (Attachments: #1 CONSENT FORM)(cjh, ) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE BY JUDGE PADOVA CHAMBERS RE: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/12/21 IS CANCELLED; ETC. (JL ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including FDO Acquisition Corp. and Floor & Decor Holdings, Inc. with Certificate of Service by Floor & Decor.(GOLDSTEIN, ANDREW) (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 10/12/2021 AT 2:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA BY TELEPHONE. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Scheduling Info Report)(mbh, ) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Floor & Decor.(GOLDSTEIN, ANDREW) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW C. GOLDSTEIN on behalf of Floor & Decor with Jury Demand(GOLDSTEIN, ANDREW) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Floor & Decor. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/25/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Floor & Decor ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15356539.), filed by Tyra Watkins.(TOMLINSON, TYLER) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Floor and Decor Outlets of America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW C. GOLDSTEIN