This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2022 at 10:06:27 (UTC).

Watkins v. CNO Services LLC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 Watkins filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against CNO Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela Pepper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01427

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela Pepper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Annie Watkins

Defendant

CNO Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott S Luzi

Attorney at Walcheske & Luzi, LLC

235 N. Executive Dr - Ste 240

Brookfield, WI 53005

David M Potteiger

Attorney at Walcheske & Luzi LLC

235 N Executive Dr - Ste 240

Brookfield, WI 53005

James A Walcheske

Attorney at Walcheske & Luzi LLC

15850 W Bluemound Rd - Ste 304

Brookfield, WI 53005

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons - CNO Financial Group, Inc.

1 #3

Summons - Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc.

1 #4

Annie Watkins Consent To Join Form

#2

(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Annie Watkins. (Luzi, Scott)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S Luzi on behalf of Annie Watkins. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott S. Luzi, James A. Walcheske, David M. Potteiger (Luzi, Scott)

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CNO Financial Group Inc - Waiver sent on 12/16/2021. (Luzi, Scott)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Medix Staffing Solutions Inc - Waiver sent on 12/16/2021. (Luzi, Scott)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L Nickels on behalf of CNO Financial Group Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher L. Nickels (Nickels, Christopher)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Annie Watkins of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc. (Luzi, Scott)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CNO Services, LLC filed by Annie Watkins.(Luzi, Scott)

#10

(#10) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Annie Watkins (Luzi, Scott)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketSummons Issued as to CNO Services LLC. (asc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketParty CNO Financial Group Inc terminated. (asc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Annie Watkins (Luzi, Scott)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against CNO Services, LLC filed by Annie Watkins.(Luzi, Scott)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketParty Medix Staffing Solutions Inc terminated. (asc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by Annie Watkins of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc. (Luzi, Scott)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L Nickels on behalf of CNO Financial Group Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher L. Nickels (Nickels, Christopher)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Medix Staffing Solutions Inc - Waiver sent on 12/16/2021. (Luzi, Scott)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CNO Financial Group Inc - Waiver sent on 12/16/2021. (Luzi, Scott)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (asc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Annie Watkins. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Luzi, Scott)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S Luzi on behalf of Annie Watkins. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott S. Luzi, James A. Walcheske, David M. Potteiger (Luzi, Scott)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE Statement by Annie Watkins. (Luzi, Scott)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against CNO Financial Group, Inc., Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc. by Annie Watkins. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3997630) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - CNO Financial Group, Inc., #3 Summons - Medix Staffing Solutions, Inc., #4 Annie Watkins Consent To Join Form)(Luzi, Scott)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CNO Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M Potteiger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James A Walcheske