This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2020 at 13:43:59 (UTC).

Watkins v. Baltimore City et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 Watkins filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Baltimore City. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine C. Blake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00208

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine C. Blake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nafiz Watkins

Hagerstown, MD 21746

Defendants

Fatima Patterson

Oiuyemi Abiodun

Baltimore City

Hall

John Doe

The Deputy Warden for Security at Baltimore City Booking and Intake Center

Kevin Hickson

Solomon

Crawford

Jane Doe

The Secretary of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services

The Medical Administrator of Baltimore City Booking and Intake Center

Jackson

Allen

Warden

The Commissioner of the Division of Pretrial Detention and Services

Telp

Captain Hines

The Warden of Baltimore City Booking and Intake Center

2 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

14 #2

Declaration

14 #1

Memorandum in Support

#14

#13

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

11 #2

Text of Proposed Order

11 #1

Declaration

#11

#10

9 #1

Institutional Coordinator Letter

#9

8 #1

Envelope

5 #2

Text of Proposed Order

5 #1

Declaration

#5

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Nafiz Watkins (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration)(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER Granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 3/11/2020. (c/m 3/11/2020 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Extension of Time to and including March 18, 2020 by The Office of the Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ryden, David) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Nafiz Watkins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Ryden on behalf of The Office of the Attorney General (Ryden, David) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint,, filed by Nafiz Watkins ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 2/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Institutional Coordinator Letter) (c/m 2/12/2020 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Correspondence received from Nafiz Watkins re: Case Status. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Nafiz Watkins(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Nafiz Watkins(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Nafiz Watkins (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Directing the Finance Officer to file within 21 days an Inmate Account Summary Information Sheet for the past six months of Plaintiff's incarceration; Dismissing without prejudice #3 Motion for Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 1/29/2020. (c/m 1/29/2020 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Production of Documents by Nafiz Watkins(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nafiz Watkins(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Oiuyemi Abiodun, Allen, Baltimore City, Iesha Butler, Crawford, Jane Doe, John Doe, Hall, Kevin Hickson, Hines, Jackson, Fatima Patterson, Solomon, Telp, The Commissioner of the Division of Pretrial Detention and Services, The Deputy Warden for Security at Baltimore City Booking and Intake Center, The Medical Administrator of Baltimore City Booking and Intake Center, The Secretary of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, The Warden of Baltimore City Booking and Intake Center, Warden, Thomas Williams, filed by Nafiz Watkins.(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secratary of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services is a litigant

Latest cases where SOLOMON AKA DONALD RAY SOLOMON AKA DON R, DONALD R. is a litigant

Latest cases where Baltimore City is a litigant

Latest cases where Crawford and Company is a litigant