This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/09/2021 at 11:31:23 (UTC).

Waters v. CRST

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 Waters filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CRST. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Martin C. Carlson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00226

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin C. Carlson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jill Waters

Defendants

Hugh Brown

CRST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

John M Nolan, III

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #4

Mailing Label - Hugh Brown

5 #3

AO_398 - Hugh Brown

5 #2

CRST Mailing Label

5 #1

AO_399

#5

#4

3 #1

Notice & Consent

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to CRST, Jill Waters YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 4/15/2021. (kjn) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by CRST. (Nolan, John) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by CRST. (Nolan, John) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John M Nolan, III on behalf of CRST (Nolan, John) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Hugh Brown containing complaint #1 , waiver of service forms #5 , and order from 02/09/2021 #4 , marked "return to sender, no such number." (ibr) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING PRACTICE ORDER Issued. (rw) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to CRST. Waiver of Service due by 3/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 AO_399, #2 CRST Mailing Label)(kjn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/9/2021: #3 AO_398 - Hugh Brown, #4 Mailing Label - Hugh Brown) (kjn). (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jill Waters. / ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendant(s). Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on February 9, 2021. (kjn) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice & Consent) (rw) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Jill Waters.(rw) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CRST lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Jill Waters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rw) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less