This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2021 at 09:07:41 (UTC).

Waterman v. Vine Energy Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 Waterman filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Vine Energy Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie Abrams. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08094

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marc Waterman

Defendants

Vine Energy Inc.

Eric Marsh

Angelo Acconcia

H. Paulett Eberhart

David Foley

John H. Lee

Charles M. Sledge

Chesapeake Energy Corporation

Hannibal Merger Sub, Inc.

Hannibal Merger Sub, LLC

Vine Energy Holdings LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gina M. Serra

Attorney at Rigrodsky Law, P.A.

825 East Gate Boulevard, Suite 300

Garden City, NY 11530

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

(#4) ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: The Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. Plaintiff Waterman is directed to serve Defendants with a copy of this order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/17/2021 at 10:15 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/1/2021) (tg) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Angelo Acconcia, Chesapeake Energy Corporation, H. Paulett Eberhart, David Foley, Hannibal Merger Sub, Inc., Hannibal Merger Sub, LLC, John H. Lee, Eric Marsh, Charles M. Sledge, Vine Energy Holdings LLC, Vine Energy Inc.. Document filed by Marc Waterman. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Angelo Acconcia, Chesapeake Energy Corporation, H. Paulett Eberhart, David Foley, Hannibal Merger Sub, Inc., Hannibal Merger Sub, LLC, John H. Lee, Eric Marsh, Charles M. Sledge, Vine Energy Holdings LLC, Vine Energy Inc.. Document filed by Marc Waterman. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: The Court will hold this conference by telephone. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. This conference line is open to the public. Plaintiff Waterman is directed to serve Defendants with a copy of this order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/17/2021 at 10:15 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 11/1/2021) (tg) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-07742-RA. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Ronnie Abrams as possibly related to 21cv7742. (pc) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-7742. Document filed by Marc Waterman..(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Angelo Acconcia, Chesapeake Energy Corporation, H. Paulett Eberhart, David Foley, Hannibal Merger Sub, Inc., Hannibal Merger Sub, LLC, John H. Lee, Eric Marsh, Charles M. Sledge, Vine Energy Holdings LLC, Vine Energy Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25129103)Document filed by Marc Waterman..(Serra, Gina) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chesapeake Energy Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gina M. Serra