This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/13/2021 at 10:07:32 (UTC).

Washington v. Wygul et al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 Washington filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Wygul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diana Song Quiroga and Diana Saldana. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00017

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Diana Song Quiroga

Presiding Judge

Diana Saldana

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Latisha Washington

Defendants

Village Travel, LLC

Jeffery Wygul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Paul Skrabanek

Attorney at Pierce Skrabanek, PLLC

3701 Kirby Dr., Ste 760

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorney

Luis R Rodriguez

Attorney at Cotten Schmidt LLP

711 N Carancahua, Ste 1800

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

 

Court Documents

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #13

Exhibit C-10 - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Exhibit C-9 - Certificate of Notice of Filing

1 #9

Exhibit C-6 - List of Counsel

1 #8

Exhibit C-5 - Defendants Answer

1 #7

Exhibit C-4 - Affidavit of Service on Village Travel

1 #6

Exhibit C-3 - Affidavit of Service on J. Wygul

1 #5

Exhibit C-2 - Letter

1 #4

Exhibit C-1 - Compliant

1 #3

Exhibit C - Index of Documents being filed

1 #1

Exhibit A - Affidvait of Jeffrey Arensdorf

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 4/13/2021 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 6/30/2021. Deft Expert Witness List due by 8/11/2021. Discovery due by 9/30/2021. Mediation due by 10/14/2021. Court Mediation due by 8/25/2021. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/28/2021.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified.(vcantu, 5) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **This entry is a duplicate of #3 and has been terminated** ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/30/2021 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified.(vcantu, 5) Modified on 3/30/2021 (vcantu, 5). (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docket5:21-cv-17, Washington v. Wygul, et al. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. Initial Pretrial Status Conference held on 03/30/2021. Plaintiff appeared telephonically through counsel Paul Skrabanek. Defendants appeared through counsel Luis Rodriguez. The Court held an initial pretrial status conference. Plaintiff confirmed that she has supplied Defendants with some medical documents. Plaintiff also reported that she might be undergoing surgery soon and the Court instructed the parties to confer in good faith pursuant to Federal Rule 35 regarding any medical examination issues that might arise. The Court reviewed the proposed scheduling order with the parties, and they agreed to all proposed deadlines. The Court further advised the parties that they should file any continuance requests three days in advance of the relevant deadline and promptly notify the Court by advisory of any settlement developments. The Court will issue a scheduling order. Appearances: Attorney Paul Skrabanek f/PLAINTIFF; Attorney Luis Rodriguez f/DEFENDANTS. (9:35-9:49) (ERO: Cody Arnold) (Filed, clchalbeck, 5). (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Village Travel, LLC, Jeffery Wygul, filed.(Rodriguez, Luis) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Village Travel, LLC, Jeffery Wygul, filed.(Rodriguez, Luis) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Latisha Washington, filed.(Skrabanek, Matthew) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/30/2021 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified.(dmorales, 5) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) First AMENDED ANSWER to by Village Travel, LLC, Jeffery Wygul, filed. (Rodriguez, Luis) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 49th District Court of Webb County, Texas, case number 2021CVA000042D1 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25967023) filed by Village Travel, LLC, Jeffery Wygul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidvait of Jeffrey Arensdorf, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Jeffrey Wygul, #3 Exhibit C - Index of Documents being filed, #4 Exhibit C-1 - Compliant, #5 Exhibit C-2 - Letter, #6 Exhibit C-3 - Affidavit of Service on J. Wygul, #7 Exhibit C-4 - Affidavit of Service on Village Travel, #8 Exhibit C-5 - Defendants Answer, #9 Exhibit C-6 - List of Counsel, #10 Exhibit C-7 - State Court Docket Sheet, #11 Exhibit C-8 - Notice to State Court, #12 Exhibit C-9 - Certificate of Notice of Filing, #13 Exhibit C-10 - Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodriguez, Luis) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Paul Skrabanek