This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:47:05 (UTC).

Washington v. Walsh et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Washington filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Walsh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine E. Bucklo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03335

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elaine E. Bucklo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lynn Washington

Defendants

Tom Dart

Director of Cook County

Walsh

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Lynn Washington for attorney representation (bg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and No copies by Lynn Washington (Exhibits) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Envelope not postmarked) (bg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this lawsuit, he must pay the $400 filing fee. Plaintiff's failure to pay the filing fee by July 8, 2019, will result in summary dismissal of this action. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on May 23, 2019. Mailed notice (ph, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Lynn Washington for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (bg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MAILED Plaintiff a copy of order #5 dated 5/23/2019. (ph, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this lawsuit, he must pay the $400 filing fee. Plaintiff's failure to pay the filing fee by July 8, 2019, will result in summary dismissal of this action. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on May 23, 2019. Mailed notice (ph, ) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Lynn Washington for attorney representation (bg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Lynn Washington for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (bg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) RECEIVED Complaint and No copies by Lynn Washington (Exhibits) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Envelope not postmarked) (bg, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.