This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2020 at 08:12:19 (UTC).

Washington v. Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections

Case Summary

On 06/14/2020 Washington filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01297

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tyane Washington

Defendants

Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections

Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections doing business as Grafton Correctional Institution

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James J.B. Hux

Attorney at Ste. 18147

3 Severance Circle

Cleveland Heights, OH 44118

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections on 6/22/2020, filed on behalf of Tyane Washington Related document(s) #2 . (J,FE) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

2 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#2

(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint for damages and injunctive relief with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10041164. Filed by Tyane Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue) (Hux, James) (Entered: 06/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections on 6/22/2020, filed on behalf of Tyane Washington Related document(s) #2 . (J,FE) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketService by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 9514 7067 0981 0168 2527 48. (L,MI) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Ohio Department of Rehabilitation and Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (L,MI) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketJudge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint for damages and injunctive relief with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number AOHNDC-10041164. Filed by Tyane Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue) (Hux, James) (Entered: 06/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ohio Department of Rehabilitation & Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James J.B. Hux