Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/06/2021 at 08:37:03 (UTC).

Washington v. Medical Staff Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2021 Washington filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Medical Staff Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Monte C. Richardson and Marcia Morales Howard. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00373

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Monte C. Richardson

Presiding Judge

Marcia Morales Howard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gregory F. Washington

Sneads, FL 32460-4165

Defendants

Medical Staff Inc.

Officer X

Nurse X

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/12/2021. (CAW) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

2 #1

Trust Fund Account Statement

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Gregory F. Washington. (Attachments: #1 Trust Fund Account Statement)(BGR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Entered: 04/07/2021)

1 #1

Mailing Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Medical Staff Inc., Nurse X, Officer X filed by Gregory F. Washington. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (No service copies received)(BGR) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the Northern District of FL as case 3:21-cv-603, filed on 4/13/2021. (SJW) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#4) CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Florida. (SJW) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida; directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Marcia Morales Howard on 4/12/2021. (CAW) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Gregory F. Washington. (Attachments: #1 Trust Fund Account Statement)(BGR) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Medical Staff Inc., Nurse X, Officer X filed by Gregory F. Washington. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (No service copies received)(BGR) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDICAL STAFF is a litigant