This case was last updated from PACER on 08/25/2020 at 08:12:58 (UTC).

Washington v. KLM Royal Dutch Airlines

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 Washington filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against KLM Royal Dutch Airlines. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04268

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Denise Washington

Defendant

KLM Royal Dutch Airlines

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H. Nathan James

Attorney at Seifer, Murken, Despina & James

2135 Lombard Street

San Francisco, CA 94123

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer J. Johnston

Attorney at Condon & Forsyth LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 850

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6010

Ivy Larsen Nowinski

Attorney at Condon Forsyth

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 850

La, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/15/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by KLM Royal Dutch Airlines.. (Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V. to Plaintiff's Complaint byKLM Royal Dutch Airlines. (Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/1/2020) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

4 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal of C

#4

(#4) NOTICE by KLM Royal Dutch Airlines re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal of Civil Action to United States District Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal of Civil Action to USDC)(Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/26/2020) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KLM Royal Dutch Airlines identifying Corporate Parent Air France-KLM Group, a publicly-held corporation for KLM Royal Dutch Airlines. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Corporate Disclosure Statement of Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/26/2020) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by KLM Royal Dutch Airlines identifying Corporate Parent Air France-KLM, Corporate Parent Air France-KLM, Other Affiliate Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V. for KLM Royal Dutch Airlines. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Certification of Interested Entities or Persons of Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij M.V. (Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/26/2020) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet to Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Notice of Removal of Civil Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1441 on the Grounds of Diversity of Citizenship and Federal Question Jurisdiction Under 28 U.S.C. Sections 1332 and 1331 from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-580358. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14627149). Filed byKLM Royal Dutch Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet to Notice of Removal)(Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/26/2020) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for October 6, 2020, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by September 29th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:20-cv-04268-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 7/15/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2020) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by KLM Royal Dutch Airlines.. (Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/13/2020) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V. to Plaintiff's Complaint byKLM Royal Dutch Airlines. (Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/1/2020) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/13/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by KLM Royal Dutch Airlines re #1 Notice of Removal,, Notice to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal of Civil Action to United States District Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice to Adverse Party of Filing of Notice of Removal of Civil Action to USDC)(Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/26/2020) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KLM Royal Dutch Airlines identifying Corporate Parent Air France-KLM Group, a publicly-held corporation for KLM Royal Dutch Airlines. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Corporate Disclosure Statement of Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 (Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/26/2020) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by KLM Royal Dutch Airlines identifying Corporate Parent Air France-KLM, Corporate Parent Air France-KLM, Other Affiliate Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij N.V. for KLM Royal Dutch Airlines. re #1 Notice of Removal,, Certification of Interested Entities or Persons of Koninklijke Luchtvaart Maatschappij M.V. (Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/26/2020) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Notice of Removal of Civil Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1441 on the Grounds of Diversity of Citizenship and Federal Question Jurisdiction Under 28 U.S.C. Sections 1332 and 1331 from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-580358. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14627149). Filed byKLM Royal Dutch Airlines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet to Notice of Removal)(Johnston, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/26/2020) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less