This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2019 at 07:06:24 (UTC).

Washington v. Illinois Department Of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2019 Washington filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Illinois Department Of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John J. Tharp, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03252

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J. Tharp, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joshua Washington

Defendants

T. Wade

Illinois Department Of Corrections

C/O Manning

Stateville/NRC

Lt. Porter

Pinckneyville CC

Pinckneyville Correctional Center

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER: Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is denied. By August 16, 2019, Plaintiff must prepay the $400 filing fee. His failure to comply will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice. See N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.3(f). Plaintiffs motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice. The Court withholds its initial review of the complaint until resolution of the filing fee requirement. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 6/17/2019. Mailed notice (nsf, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Joshua Washington for attorney assistance. (gcy, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

3 #1

(No Envelope Postmark date).

#3

(#3) RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Joshua Washington (Attachments: #1 (No Envelope Postmark date).)(gcy, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Joshua Washington for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (Attachments). (gcy, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#1

(#1) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is denied. By August 16, 2019, Plaintiff must prepay the $400 filing fee. His failure to comply will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice. See N.D. Ill. Local Rule 3.3(f). Plaintiffs motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice. The Court withholds its initial review of the complaint until resolution of the filing fee requirement. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 6/17/2019. Mailed notice (nsf, ) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Joshua Washington for attorney assistance. (gcy, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Joshua Washington (Attachments: #1 (No Envelope Postmark date).)(gcy, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Joshua Washington for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (Attachments). (gcy, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, ) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PINCKNEYVILLE CORRECTIONAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Stateville NRC is a litigant

Latest cases where Illinois Department of Corrections is a litigant