This case was last updated from PACER on 09/23/2019 at 08:26:09 (UTC).

Washington v. Flenory et al

Case Summary

On 07/25/2019 Washington filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Flenory. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew J. Kacsmaryk and Lee Ann Reno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00154

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew J. Kacsmaryk

Referral Judge

Lee Ann Reno

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kaaream Washington

Amarillo, TX 79107

Defendants

Kendall T Richerson

Leslie Lindsey

Cipriano Garcia

Samuel Eilers

Aaron Herrera

Yolanda Flenory

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kaaream Washington. (nhp) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#6

(#6) FILING FEE ORDER: It is ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. 2. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $0.00 and the agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward the amount of such initial partial filing fee forthwith. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) Motions terminated: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kaaream Washington. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 9/20/2019) (nhp) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Kaaream Washington. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (nhp) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

2 #1

General Order Concerning Litigation

#2

(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (Attachments: #1 General Order Concerning Litigation) (nhp) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

#5

(#5) Certificate of Trust Account by Kaaream Washington TDCJ # 01644868. (nhp) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#1

(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nhp) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Fri Sep 20 15:30:00 CDT 2019 (crt) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FILING FEE ORDER: It is ORDERED that: 1. Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. 2. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $0.00 and the agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward the amount of such initial partial filing fee forthwith. (Clerk note: TDCJ Inmate Trust Office has been electronically notified of this order.) Motions terminated: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kaaream Washington. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 9/20/2019) (nhp) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certificate of Trust Account by Kaaream Washington TDCJ # 01644868. (nhp) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. (Copy of 1st page of complaint also mailed to Plaintiff) Tue Jul 30 09:41:29 CDT 2019 (crt) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kaaream Washington. (nhp) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Kaaream Washington. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (nhp) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (Attachments: #1 General Order Concerning Litigation) (nhp) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nhp) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.